This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 08/14/2020 at 19:09:00 (UTC).

BENOIT, CHRISSY V STOFFO, ROSEMARIE

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 BENOIT, CHRISSY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STOFFO, ROSEMARIE. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CORLEW , REGINALD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CORLEW , REGINALD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BENOIT , CHRISSY

Defendants and Respondents

STOFFO , ROSEMARIE

BAKER , DAVID

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO DISMISS

08/04/2020:MOTION TO DISMISS

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/10/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $320.00 ON RECEIPT 3679476

07/10/2020:PAID $320.00 ON RECEIPT 3679476

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/10/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

07/10/2020:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/10/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

07/10/2020:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2020
  • HearingSCPTHP - Small Claims Pretrial Pro Se; Location:SB; Room:#6 (South Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Notes:FOR LACK OF ACTION AND LACK OF JURISDICTION F/B DFT'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3679476; Receipt Amount: $320.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$320.00; total Amount Paid:$320.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:07/10/2020; Description:Summons $10.00; Amount Due:$20.00; Amount Paid:$20.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:07/10/2020; Description:400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due:$300.00; Amount Paid:$300.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $320.00 ON RECEIPT 3679476; Notes:$320.00 3679476 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PRO SE 8/26/2020 9:00 AM CORLEW, JUDGEREGINALD; Notes:SCPTHP - Small Claims Pretrial Pro Se 8/26/2020 9:00 AM CORLEW, JUDGEREGINALD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RD: South Branch County Civil Division - RD (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less