This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 02/09/2021 at 13:08:52 (UTC).

BEDROSIAN, KARAKIAN

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 BEDROSIAN, KARAKIAN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURIE , LAURA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LAURIE , LAURA

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Classified By Court

BEDROSIAN , ROSE KEMBLE

BEDROSIAN , EDVARDT EDWARD

Decedent

BEDROSIAN , KARAKIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorneys

RUBIN , JENNA G

MILLER , LAWRENCE JAY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketORDER EXTENDING TIME; Notes:FOR FILING INVENTORY SIGNED BY JUDGE LAURIE ON JAN 19, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION; Notes:F/B PR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2021
  • DocketNON-TAX CERT/RCPT/AFFIDAVIT; Notes:F/B ROSE KEMBLE BEDROSIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2021
  • DocketNON-TAX CERT/RCPT/AFFIDAVIT; Notes:F/B EDVARDT EDWARD BEDROSIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3870776; Receipt Amount: $16.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$530.00; total Amount Paid:$530.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:01/12/2021; Description:CP Probate Service Charges PB; Amount Due:$16.00; Amount Paid:$16.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketPETITION TO EXTEND TIME; Notes:FOR FILING INVENTORY F/B ROSE BEDROSIAN AND EDVARDT E BEDROSIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketPAID $16.00 ON RECEIPT 3870776; Notes:$16.00 3870776 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:10/15/2020; Description:500FF Formal Administration; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketPAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 3779213; Notes:$401.00 3779213 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:IX: South Branch Probate - IX (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketWILL BOOK 31926 PAGE 76-83

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR APPOINTMENT; Notes:OF COMMISSIONER (BARBARA DALY) F/B PETR, ROSE BEDROSIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR APPOINTMENT; Notes:OF COMMISSIONER (DAVID N NARCISO) F/B PETR, ROSE BEDROSIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING; Notes:F/B ATTY RUBIN OBO PETR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT; Notes:COPY F/B PETR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketOATH; Notes:OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT F/B ROSE KEMBLE BEDROSIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION; Notes:F/B PETR, ROSE KEMBLE BEDROSIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUBIN , JENNA G