This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/12/2019 at 00:19:33 (UTC).

BEDOLLA LOEZA, JOSE V PULTE HOME COMPANY LLC

Case Summary

On 03/26/2019 BEDOLLA LOEZA, JOSE filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against PULTE HOME COMPANY LLC. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURLEY , G JOSEPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURLEY , G JOSEPH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

MORALES , ROSAURA

BEDOLLA LOEZA , JOSE

Defendants, Petitioners, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

PULTE HOME COMPANY LLC

MORALES , ROSAURA

BEDOLLA LOEZA , JOSE

Defendants, Respondents, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

SCHNARS ENGINEERING CORP

PULTEGROUP INC

PULTE HOME COMPANY LLC

AKA SERVICES INC

PIPELINE UTILITIES INC

US CONCRETE PRODUCTS CORP

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Defendants

SCHNARS ENGINEERING CORP

AKA SERVICES INC

PIPELINE UTILITIES INC

US CONCRETE PRODUCTS CORP

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

WEISSER , JASON D

Defendant, Respondent, Petitioner and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

TERPENING , JAMES P

WEISSER , JASON D

Defendant, Respondent, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

DERREVERE , JON D

VERTES , WILLIAM W

TERPENING , JAMES P

BURTON ESQ, MARK C

NATHANSON ESQ, JOSHUA

WEISER , GREGG J

Defendant, Respondent and Cross Defendant Attorneys

DERREVERE , JON D

VERTES , WILLIAM W

BURTON ESQ, MARK C

NATHANSON ESQ, JOSHUA

WEISER , GREGG J

 

Court Documents

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

07/03/2019:REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE PRIVILEGE LOG FILED BY PIPELINE UTILITIES

07/01/2019:NOTICE PRIVILEGE LOG FILED BY PIPELINE UTILITIES

ORDER G CURLEY: PLTS' EX PARTE ORDER COMPELLING DISCOVERY: DFT, PIPELINE UTILITIES INC SHALL HAVE 10 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS. SEE ORDER. DTD 6-19-19

06/19/2019:ORDER G CURLEY: PLTS' EX PARTE ORDER COMPELLING DISCOVERY: DFT, PIPELINE UTILITIES INC SHALL HAVE 10 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS. SEE ORDER. DTD 6-19-19

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

06/13/2019:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF HEARING

06/13/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

05/23/2019:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

05/14/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/06/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/06/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

04/23/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

PAID $395.00 ON RECEIPT 3135344

04/23/2019:PAID $395.00 ON RECEIPT 3135344

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

04/10/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

04/03/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

PAID $463.50 ON RECEIPT 3099614

03/27/2019:PAID $463.50 ON RECEIPT 3099614

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/26/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

03/26/2019:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/26/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/26/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

77 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:DEFENDANT, PULTE HOME COMPANY, LLC'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, AKA SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; Notes:WITH COURT ORDER DATED JUNE 27, 2019 F/B DFT PULTE HOME COMPANY LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:TO DFT A/K/A SERVICES INC F/B PLTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE; Notes:RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION DATED 3-26-19 FILED BY PIPELINE UTILITIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE PRIVILEGE LOG FILED BY PIPELINE UTILITIES; Notes:PRIVILEGE LOG FILED BY PIPELINE UTILITIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; Notes:WITH COURT ORDER DATED 6-27-19 FILED BY PLTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:(AMENDED) AND EMAIL DESIGNATION F/B ATTY VERTES OBO DFT SCHNARS ENGINEERING CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AGREED ORDER CURLEY DTD 6/27/19 GRANTING MOTION FOR THE ENTRY OF AN ORDER REQUIRING THE PARTIES TO THIS LITTGATION TO PROVIDE COPIES OF ITEMS OBTAINED PURSUANT TO DISCOVERY TO OTHER PARTIES INVOLVED IN THIS LITIGATION; Notes:CURLEY DTD 6/27/19 GRANTING MOTION FOR THE ENTRY OF AN ORDER REQUIRING THE PARTIES TO THIS LITTGATION TO PROVIDE COPIES OF ITEMS OBTAINED PURSUANT TO DISCOVERY TO OTHER PARTIES INVOLVED IN THIS LITIGATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES; Notes:F/B DFT PIPELINE UTILITIES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:DISCLOSURE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION F/B ATTY MARK C BURTON OBO DFT AKA SERVICES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
87 More Docket Entries
  • 05/06/2019
  • Due Date:05/06/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Due Date:04/23/2019; Description:8CTP CA General Cross Counter 3rd Party PB_070117; Amount Due:$395.00; Amount Paid:$395.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Due Date:03/27/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Due Date:03/27/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Due Date:03/27/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Due Date:03/27/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Due Date:03/27/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Due Date:03/27/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Due Date:03/27/2019; Description:8XDT Additional DFT over 5 $2.50; Amount Due:$2.50; Amount Paid:$2.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Due Date:03/27/2019; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less