This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 02/19/2021 at 17:35:00 (UTC).

BARZELATTO, DOMINICK

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 BARZELATTO, DOMINICK was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FRANCIS , RENATHA S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FRANCIS , RENATHA S

 

Party Details

Petitioners

BARZELATTO , RICHARD

BARZELATTO , CRAIG

INGRAO , LAURIE

Decedent

BARZELATTO , DOMINICK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

KATZ , MARTIN V

KATZ , MARTIN VICTOR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT; Notes:ORIGINAL F/B PETR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes:F/B AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK NO SIGNED LETTERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes:NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketSTATUS ORDER; Notes:SIGNED BY JUDGE FRANCIS ON JAN 26, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT; Notes:ORIGINAL F/B PETR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketWILL; Notes:ORIGINAL DTD 11/21/2019 F/B PETR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3875994; Receipt Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$401.00; total Amount Paid:$401.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:01/15/2021; Description:500FF Formal Administration; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketPAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 3875994; Notes:$401.00 3875994 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketOATH; Notes:OF PR AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT F/B RICHARD BARZELATTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketOATH; Notes:OF PR AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT F/B CRAIG BARZELATTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketOATH; Notes:OF PR AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT F/B LAURIE INGRAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION; Notes:F/B PETITIONERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketWILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING; Notes:F/B ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:IC: Probate Central, MH, Guardianship - IC (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KATZ , MARTIN V