Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 04/01/2021 at 19:52:15 (UTC).

BARR ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC V METHODE LAFAY LLC

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 BARR ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against METHODE LAFAY LLC. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KEYSER , GREGORY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KEYSER , GREGORY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BARR ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC

Defendants and Respondents

WILLIAMS , CHARLES

PALISADES COLLECTIONS LLC ASSIGNEE OF AT&T

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

WALKER , TIFFANY

METHODE LAFAY LLC

CITY OF BOYNTON BEACH

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SHAFRITZ , HUGH B

 

Court Documents

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/26/2021:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

03/18/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

03/11/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

03/11/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

03/11/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

03/11/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

03/11/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

03/11/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

COMPLAINT

02/25/2021:COMPLAINT

PAID $481.60 ON RECEIPT 3927894

03/02/2021:PAID $481.60 ON RECEIPT 3927894

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/25/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/25/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/25/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/25/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/25/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/25/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

LIS PENDENS

02/25/2021:LIS PENDENS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/25/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:AND REQUEST FOR SURPLUS - F/B DFT CITY OF BOYNTON BEACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE PALLSADES COLLECTION LLC - 03/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:SERVED METHODE LAFAY LLC - 3/8/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:SERVED TIFFANY WEAVER - 3/8/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:SERVED CHARLES WILLIAMS - 03/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT 2 - 3/8/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT 1 - 3/8/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:SERVED CITY OF BOYNTON BEACH - 03/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3927894; Receipt Amount: $481.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$481.60; total Amount Paid:$481.60; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:efiling@collectionslawfirm.com;tracey@collectionslawfirm.com AS TO UNKNOWN TENANT 2 EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:efiling@collectionslawfirm.com;tracey@collectionslawfirm.com AS TO UNKNOWN TENANT 1 EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:efiling@collectionslawfirm.com;tracey@collectionslawfirm.com AS TO CHARLES WILLIAMS EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:efiling@collectionslawfirm.com;tracey@collectionslawfirm.com AS TO TIFFANY WALKER EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:efiling@collectionslawfirm.com;tracey@collectionslawfirm.com AS TO CITY OF BOYNTON BEACH EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:efiling@collectionslawfirm.com;tracey@collectionslawfirm.com AS TO PALISADES COLLECTION LLC ASSIGNEE OF AT&T EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:efiling@collectionslawfirm.com;tracey@collectionslawfirm.com AS TO METHODE LAFAY LLC EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 32245 PAGE 986-986; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:TO FORECLOSE JUDGMENT LIEN F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PALISADES COLLECTION LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAFRITZ , HUGH BRETT