This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 11/02/2021 at 15:05:41 (UTC).

BANKUNITED, N.A. V TRIPLE G MANAGEMENT INC

Case Summary

On 09/28/2021 BANKUNITED, N A filed an Other lawsuit against TRIPLE G MANAGEMENT INC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRISTOW , APRIL and BOSSOPARDO , SANDRA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRISTOW , APRIL

BOSSOPARDO , SANDRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BANKUNITED, N.A.

Defendants and Respondents

GAFFOOR , SHAMSHUDEEN

TRIPLE G MANAGEMENT INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

TOLAND , HOWARD S

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/28/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

09/28/2021:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/28/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/28/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $320.00 ON RECEIPT 4192752

09/29/2021:PAID $320.00 ON RECEIPT 4192752

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/20/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/20/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

ANSWER

10/22/2021:ANSWER

ANSWER

10/29/2021:ANSWER

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Notes:F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Notes:F/B SHAMSHUDEEN GAFFOOR AS PRO SE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED SHAMSHUDEEN GAFFOOR AKA SHAMSHYDE GAFFOOR - 10/6/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TRIPLE G MANAGEMENT INC - 10/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4192752; Receipt Amount: $320.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$320.00; total Amount Paid:$320.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:09/29/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:09/29/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:09/29/2021; Description:400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due:$300.00; Amount Paid:$300.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $320.00 ON RECEIPT 4192752; Notes:$320.00 4192752 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RF: County Civil Central - RF (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:htoland@mitrani.com;ssilver@mitrani.com;slall@mitrani.com SHAMSHUDEEN GAFFOOR AKA SHAMSHYDE GAFFOOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:htoland@mitrani.com;ssilver@mitrani.com;slall@mitrani.com TRIPLE G MANAGEMENT INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOWARD TOLAND