This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 08/21/2019 at 02:35:14 (UTC).

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON V WOLDER, LEETAL

Case Summary

On 12/04/2018 BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against WOLDER, LEETAL. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KERNER , SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KERNER , SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

Defendants and Respondents

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF SUBJECT PROPERTY

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DARYL M WOLDER

CORAL ISLE AT BOCA CHASE MASTER HOMEOWN ASSOCIATION INC

WOLDER , DARYL M

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LEETAL WOLDER

BOCA CHASE PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED

IMPRESSIONS AT BOCA CHASE RECREATION ASSOCIATION INC

WOLDER , LEETAL

REGIONS BANK AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO UNION PLANTERS BANK NA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

JAGENDORF , IAN D

CALDERONE , TAMMI M

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

AMKRAUT , SETH M.

WASSERSTEIN , DANIEL

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES

07/10/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

07/10/2019:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

05/02/2019:REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

03/13/2019:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

02/22/2019:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

NOTICE GENERAL ALLEGATIONS F/B R CHOSID OBO DFTS

02/21/2019:NOTICE GENERAL ALLEGATIONS F/B R CHOSID OBO DFTS

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/21/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/21/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/21/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/21/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

ANSWER

12/19/2018:ANSWER

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/04/2018:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/04/2018:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/04/2018:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/04/2018:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/04/2018:SUMMONS ISSUED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/04/2018:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

COMPLAINT

12/04/2018:COMPLAINT

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED; Notes:PLEADINGS@VANLAWFL.COM UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LEETAL WOLDER; UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF SUBJECT PROPERTY; IMPRESSIONS AT BOCA CHASE RECREATION ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S DEFAULT; Notes:PLEADINGS@VANLAWFL.COM REGIONS BANK, AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO UNION PLANTERS BANK N.A.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • NOTICE OF FILING; Notes:ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT; Notes:SUPPORTING PLT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT - F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT; Notes:OF TIME AND EFFORT - F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Notes:IN MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE - F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY; Notes:AS TO UNKNOWN HEIRS OF LEETAL WOLDER; UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DARYL M WOLDER A/K/A DARYL MARK WOLDER A/K/A DARYL WOLDER; UNKNOWN HEIRS OF DARYL M WOLDER A/K/A DARYL MARK WOLDER A/K/A DARYL WOLDER - F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes:UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF SUBJECT PROPERTY - F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2018
  • Due Date:12/05/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Due Date:12/05/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Due Date:12/05/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Due Date:12/05/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Due Date:12/05/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Due Date:12/05/2018; Description:Lis Pendens 2nd Page or additional pages $4.00; Amount Due:$4.00; Amount Paid:$4.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Due Date:12/05/2018; Description:Lis Pendens 1st Page $5.60; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Due Date:12/05/2018; Description:Efile fee INDX $1 fee party after 4; Amount Due:$7.00; Amount Paid:$7.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Due Date:12/05/2018; Description:8XDT Additional DFT over 5 $2.50; Amount Due:$15.00; Amount Paid:$15.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Due Date:12/05/2018; Description:800F3 CircCivil Real Prop$250,000 or more PB; Amount Due:$1,906.00; Amount Paid:$1,906.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less