Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/30/2019 at 15:28:51 (UTC).

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON V RODRIGUEZ, JUAN

Case Summary

On 09/25/2012 BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against RODRIGUEZ, JUAN. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

Defendants and Respondents

RODRIGUEZ, JUAN

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JUAN RODRIGUEZ

FIRST CHOICE CREDIT UNION

STATE OF FLORIDA

FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

ADVOCATE CREDIT CORP

CLERK OF CIRCUIT COURT IN AND FOR PALM BEACH COUNTY

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

UNKNOWN TENANT #1

UNKNOWN TENANT #2

RODRIGUEZ , ROSA

RODRIGUEZ , JUAN

UNKNOWN TENANT #3

UNKNOWN TENENT #4

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

GREEN , KAREN A

MACIAS ESQ, ANYA E

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

QUASCHNICK ESQ, PHILLIP P

DUNN , MARK S

DUNN ESQ, ROBERT D

PETERSON , HAMPTON C

COFFMAN ESQ, DENISE L

FRANK ESQ, GEORGE F

BROWN , JEFF M

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

04/28/2016:NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL

04/07/2016:ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION - DEPOSITION OF JUAN RODRIGUEZ FILED BY PLT

04/01/2016:NOTICE OF DESIGNATION - DEPOSITION OF JUAN RODRIGUEZ FILED BY PLT

OBJECTION

03/16/2016:OBJECTION

OBJECTION

03/15/2016:OBJECTION

NOTICE OF MEDIATION

02/24/2016:NOTICE OF MEDIATION

ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL

02/02/2016:ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/13/2015:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

07/13/2015:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

AGREED ORDER

07/08/2015:AGREED ORDER

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

06/16/2015:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

05/14/2015:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

NOTICE OF HEARING

05/11/2015:NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION TO STRIKE

04/23/2015:MOTION TO STRIKE

NOTICE

04/08/2015:NOTICE

DEFAULT

03/04/2014:DEFAULT

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/25/2012:SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

09/25/2012:COMPLAINT

165 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER T BARKDULL DTD 10/10/17 DIRECTING CLERK TO RETURN ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS; Notes:T BARKDULL DTD 10/10/17 DIRECTING CLERK TO RETURN ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAID $19.10 ON RECEIPT 2343899; Notes:$19.10 2343899 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • REVISED RECEIPT 2343899 CREATED $4.00 OVERAGE; Notes:2343899 CREATED $4.00 OVERAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAID $23.10 ON RECEIPT 2343899; Notes:$23.10 2343899 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR RETURN OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS FILED BY PLT; Notes:FOR RETURN OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS FILED BY PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET; Notes:FILED BY PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • RELEASE/CANCEL LIS PENDENS BOOK 29361 PAGE 215-216; Notes:NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS FILED BY PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF:; Notes:OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD WITHIN FIRM F/B ATTY GREEN OBO PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • DISPOSED AFTER OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER STAYING ACTION AND CLOSING FILE. DTD. 3/2/17 C CARACUZZO; Notes:STAYING ACTION AND CLOSING FILE. DTD. 3/2/17 C CARACUZZO

    Read MoreRead Less
193 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2012
  • Receipt Number:CAMB714650; Receipt Amount: $12.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$1,082.80; total Amount Paid:$1,082.80; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • Due Date:09/22/2017; Description:VDAL Voluntary Dismissal Legal Description; Amount Due:$0.60; Amount Paid:$0.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • Due Date:09/22/2017; Description:VD2P Volun Diss Each Additional Page $8.50; Amount Due:$8.50; Amount Paid:$8.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • Due Date:09/22/2017; Description:VD1P Volun Diss 1st Page $10.00; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • Due Date:06/01/2015; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$30.00; Amount Paid:$30.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • Due Date:05/20/2015; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$9.60; Amount Paid:$9.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2012
  • Due Date:09/25/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$112.50; Amount Paid:$112.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2012
  • Due Date:09/25/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2012
  • Due Date:09/25/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$906.00; Amount Paid:$906.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where First American Title Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PETERSON , HAMPTON C

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COFFMAN ESQ, DENISE L