This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 08/21/2019 at 02:25:22 (UTC).

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON V MICHAELS, DAVID A

Case Summary

On 12/04/2018 BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MICHAELS, DAVID A. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KERNER , SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KERNER , SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

Defendants and Respondents

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DAVID A MICHAELS

MICHAELS , RADHA

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

MICHAELS , DAVID A

WINDWOOD HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

IBM SOUTHEAST EMPLOYEES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

CHASE BANK USA NA

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RADHA MICHAELS

LAKE WINDWOOD CONDOMINIUM XIV ASSOCIATION INC

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

DELUCA , ORLANDO

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BOTSFORD , BRUCE C

SCHNER , LARRY E

BENNIS , RANDY M

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO DISMISS

07/12/2019:MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF HEARING

05/15/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/19/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/19/2019:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/19/2019:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

03/19/2019:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

RESPONSE TO: DEFENDANT, WINDWOOD HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE FILED BY PLTF

03/19/2019:RESPONSE TO: DEFENDANT, WINDWOOD HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE FILED BY PLTF

REPLY/RESPONSE

03/14/2019:REPLY/RESPONSE

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

02/01/2019:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

01/16/2019:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

ANSWER

01/03/2019:ANSWER

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

01/02/2019:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/01/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

01/01/2019:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/04/2018:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/04/2018:SUMMONS ISSUED

LIS PENDENS BOOK 30291 PAGE 1689-1690

12/04/2018:LIS PENDENS BOOK 30291 PAGE 1689-1690

COMPLAINT

12/04/2018:COMPLAINT

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING KERNER; MOTION TO STRIKE AND/OR CONTINUE NON JURY TRIAL SET FOR 8/14/2019 IS GRANTED DTD 8/7/2019; Notes:KERNER; MOTION TO STRIKE AND/OR CONTINUE NON JURY TRIAL SET FOR 8/14/2019 IS GRANTED DTD 8/7/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:NOTICE OF HEARING 08/07/2019 08:30:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO STRIKE; Notes:AND/OR CONTINUE NON JURY TRIAL SET FOR AUGUST 14, 2019 - F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WITNESS LIST; Notes:AMENDED - F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:NOTICE OF HEARING 09/17/2019 08:30:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO: IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS - F/B PLT; Notes:IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS - F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO DISMISS; Notes:CORRECTED FILED BY DFTS MICHAELS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WITNESS LIST; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Notes:CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT WITH EMBEDDED MEMORANDUM OF LAW-COURT DAVID A MICHAELS RADHA MICHAELS

    Read MoreRead Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2018
  • Due Date:12/06/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Due Date:12/06/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Due Date:12/06/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Due Date:12/06/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Due Date:12/06/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Due Date:12/06/2018; Description:Lis Pendens 2nd Page or additional pages $4.00; Amount Due:$4.00; Amount Paid:$4.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Due Date:12/06/2018; Description:Lis Pendens 1st Page $5.60; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Due Date:12/06/2018; Description:Efile fee INDX $1 fee party after 4; Amount Due:$4.00; Amount Paid:$4.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Due Date:12/06/2018; Description:8XDT Additional DFT over 5 $2.50; Amount Due:$12.50; Amount Paid:$12.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Due Date:12/06/2018; Description:800F2 CircCivil Real Prop $50,001 < $250,000 PB; Amount Due:$906.00; Amount Paid:$906.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less