Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/30/2019 at 15:46:30 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA V WILLIAMS, ROBERT S

Case Summary

On 09/26/2012 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against WILLIAMS, ROBERT S. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Defendants, Petitioners and Respondents

BANK OF AMERICA NA

WILLIAMS, ROBERT S

WILLIAMS, DONNA M

STATE OF FLORIDA

CLERK OF CIRCUIT COURT OF PALM BEACH COUNTY FLORIDA

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

UNKNOWN TENANT NO 1

UNKNOWN TENANT NO 2

ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING INTERESTS BY THROUGH UNDER

WILLIAMS , DONNA M

WILLIAMS , ROBERT S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Defendant, Petitioner and Respondent Attorneys

SUGATHAPAL ESQ, RUWAN P

SHIFRIN ESQ, MICHAEL A

BOWDEN III, ALBERT J

COFFMAN ESQ, DENISE L

PLOWMAN ESQ, CAROL ANNE

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET

04/22/2013:FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

04/22/2013:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL BOOK 25952 PAGE 1962

04/15/2013:VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL BOOK 25952 PAGE 1962

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

12/31/2012:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

RESPONSE TO:

12/31/2012:RESPONSE TO:

ANSWER

11/08/2012:ANSWER

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/15/2012:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/15/2012:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/15/2012:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/15/2012:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/15/2012:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/26/2012:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/26/2012:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/26/2012:SUMMONS ISSUED

CERTIFICATE

09/26/2012:CERTIFICATE

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/26/2012:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/26/2012:CIVIL COVER SHEET

LIS PENDENS BOOK 025494 PAGE 00795

09/26/2012:LIS PENDENS BOOK 025494 PAGE 00795

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2013
  • CHECK PRINTED; Notes:A Disbursment of $5.60 on Check Number 33349 to SHD LEGAL GROUP PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET; Notes:DBO - DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING F/B AMBER L JOHNSON - FROM PENDING QUEUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes:PLT'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (WITH COVER LETTER) F/B BANK OF AMERICA NA - FROM PENDING QUEUE Filed by PLAINTIFF BANK OF AMERICA NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2013
  • RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT; Notes:A Payment of -$12.00 was made on receipt CAMB774584. Filed by PLAINTIFF BANK OF AMERICA NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • DISPOSED BEFORE OTHER; Notes:Associated to docket VOL filed on 2013-04-15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL BOOK 25952 PAGE 1962; Notes:AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS Filed by PLAINTIFF BANK OF AMERICA NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET; Notes:DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING Filed by PLAINTIFF BANK OF AMERICA NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF:; Notes:ATTORNEY OF RECORD AND DIRECTIONS TO CLERK TO UPDATE ATTORNEY INFORMATION Filed by PLAINTIFF BANK OF AMERICA NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes:TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT, ROBERT S WILLIAMS'S INTERROGATORIES, REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS AND REQUEST TO PRODUCE Filed by PLAINTIFF BANK OF AMERICA NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO:; Notes:TO REOUEST FOR ADAIISSIONS Filed by PLAINTIFF BANK OF AMERICA NA

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2012
  • PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • ADDITIONAL COMMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2013
  • Receipt Number:CAMB774584; Receipt Amount: $17.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • Receipt Number:CAMB715402; Receipt Amount: $996.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • Receipt Number:CAMB715402; Receipt Amount: $5.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$1,013.60; total Amount Paid:$1,013.60; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • Due Date:04/15/2013; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$12.00; Amount Paid:$12.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • Due Date:09/27/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$90.00; Amount Paid:$90.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • Due Date:09/27/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • Due Date:09/27/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$906.00; Amount Paid:$906.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOWDEN III, ALBERT J

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ruwan P Sugathapala

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COFFMAN ESQ, DENISE L