This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/07/2023 at 16:41:20 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA N.A. V VALERI, CARLOS E

Case Summary

On 12/22/2022 BANK OF AMERICA N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against VALERI, CARLOS E. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHERMAN , JAMES W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHERMAN , JAMES W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

Defendant and Respondent

VALERI , CARLOS E

Boca Raton, FL 33486

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KUNDAWALA , JOY LYNN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/22/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

12/22/2022:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS REQUESTED

12/22/2022:SUMMONS REQUESTED

NOTICE OF LEAD COUNSEL OF RECORD

12/22/2022:NOTICE OF LEAD COUNSEL OF RECORD

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4721163

12/22/2022:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4721163

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/22/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

01/10/2023:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SUMMONS REQUESTED

01/23/2023:SUMMONS REQUESTED

PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4754807

01/25/2023:PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4754807

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/25/2023:ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 34093 PAGE 168-168

01/25/2023:ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 34093 PAGE 168-168

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

01/25/2023:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

03/01/2023:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2023
  • HearingCANCELLED - SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location: MB; Room: 6L (Main Branch); Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED; Notes: CARLOS E VALERI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketCancelled SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney on 3/1/2023 1:30:00 PM due to; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • HearingCANCELLED - SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location: MB; Room: 6L (Main Branch); Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4754807; Receipt Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $320.00; total Amount Paid: $320.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/25/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes: PLT'S ATTY PRESENT; DFT NO APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketDISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Notes: DB - DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 34093 PAGE 168-168; Notes: UPON NOTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT JUDGE SHERMAN 1/25/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 12/22/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 12/22/2022; Description: 400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: FLORIDA@COOLINGWINTER.COM E ISSUED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 1/25/2023 1:00 PM SHERMAN, JAMES W; Notes: SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 1/25/2023 1:00 PM SHERMAN, JAMES W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4721163; Notes: $310.00 4721163 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LEAD COUNSEL OF RECORD; Notes: OF LEAD COUNSEL OF RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RF: County Civil Central - RF (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less