This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 02/26/2022 at 05:34:48 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA V UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES AND ALL OTHERS WHO MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST IN THE ESTATE OF RICHARD CHRISTIANSEN

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES AND ALL OTHERS WHO MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST IN THE ESTATE OF RICHARD CHRISTIANSEN. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GOODMAN , JAIMIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GOODMAN , JAIMIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BANK OF AMERICA NA

Defendants and Respondents

DEZAGO , LORI

RIVERWALK OF THE PALM BEACHES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES AND ALL OTHERS WHO MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST IN THE ESTATE OF RICHARD CHRISTIANSEN

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

ROBINS , STACY

EARLE , CHRISTOPHER

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

SUGARMAN , DEBORAH S

 

Court Documents

ORDER IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

02/04/2022:ORDER IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

02/03/2022:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

NOTICE OF ACTION - PUBLICATION

01/24/2022:NOTICE OF ACTION - PUBLICATION

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

01/10/2022:AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

01/10/2022:AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

AFFIDAVIT

01/10/2022:AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT

01/10/2022:AFFIDAVIT

UNISSUED NOTICE OF ACTION

01/10/2022:UNISSUED NOTICE OF ACTION

RETURNED MAIL

01/04/2022:RETURNED MAIL

MOTION FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTE 90.201 F/B PLT

09/15/2021:MOTION FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTE 90.201 F/B PLT

CERTIFICATE

09/15/2021:CERTIFICATE

NOTICE OF FILING

09/15/2021:NOTICE OF FILING

NOTICE CERTIFICATION SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY F/B PLT

09/15/2021:NOTICE CERTIFICATION SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY F/B PLT

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

09/15/2021:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/15/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

LIS PENDENS

09/15/2021:LIS PENDENS

COMPLAINT

09/15/2021:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/15/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN; Notes:AND DESIGNATION OF THIS CASE TO THE GENERAL TRACK JUDGE J GOODMAN SIGNED 2-4-2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes:AFFIDAVIT AS TO NON-MILITARY STATUS LORI DEZAGO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION - PUBLICATION; Notes:TO LORI DEZAGO LAST KNOWN RESIDENCE: 7852 NILE RIVER ROAD WEST PALM BEACH FL 33411; UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES AND ALL OTHERS WHO MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST IN THE ESTATE OF RICHARD CHRISTIANSEN RESIDENCE UNKNOWN PUBLISH PBDBR DATES 2/1/22 & 2/8/22 MANDATORY DATE 3/3/22 ** CPY PROVIDE FOR MAILING 1-25 **( CPY MAIL TO 2030 TIGRIS DRIVE WEST PALM BEACH FL 33411; 1498 SW DEL RIO BLVD PORT SAINT LUCIE FL 34953 )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH; Notes:UNKNOWN HEIRS...ESTATE OF RICHARD CHRISTIANSEN FILED BY PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH; Notes:LORI DEZAGO FILED BY PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Notes:FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION FILED BY PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Notes:FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION FILED BY PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNISSUED NOTICE OF ACTION; Notes:EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Notes:RICHARD CHRISTIANSEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Notes:UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:ESERVICE@CLEGALGROUP.COM;STACY.ROBINS@CLEGALGROUP.COM;COURTXPRESS@FIRMSOLUTIONS.US AS TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTE 90.201 F/B PLT; Notes:FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTE 90.201 F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE; Notes:FORM A F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes:CERTIFICATION OF ORIGINAL NOTE F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CERTIFICATION SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY F/B PLT; Notes:CERTIFICATION SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes:F/B ATTY ROBINS OBO PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes:VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM/CROSSCLAIM/COUNTERCLAIM/COUNTERPETITION/THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 32890 PAGE 376-377; Notes:F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:VERIFIED FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RIVERWALK OF THE PALM BEACHES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Earle, Christopher

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robins, Stacy Dale