Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/30/2019 at 15:15:16 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA V RIVERA, LUIS A

Case Summary

On 09/25/2012 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against RIVERA, LUIS A. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BANK OF AMERICA NA

Defendants and Respondents

RIVERA, LUIS A

ROCHA, MARIA MARICELA

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

VILLAGE OF ROYAL PALM BEACH FLORIDA

VICTORIA GROVE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

TENANT

RIVERA , LUIS A

TENANT 2 NKA ERIC VANDERVERT

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

PALM BEACH COUNTY CLERK OF COURT

ROCHA , MARIA MARICELA

TENANT 1 NKA MARCIA SAMPAYO AKA MARICA VANDERVERT

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

WILKERSON , WALLACE G

ORSILLO , STEPHEN

HUMPHREY ESQ, KIMBERLY A

FAHRNEY , PAUL HUNTER

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

ASHTON , JENNIFER G

CORTEZ , LARRY T

PETERSON , HAMPTON C

 

Court Documents

RETURNED MAIL

03/11/2015:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

01/15/2015:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

01/15/2015:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

01/14/2015:RETURNED MAIL

MOTION

10/14/2014:MOTION

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/09/2014:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

RETURNED MAIL

09/15/2014:RETURNED MAIL

CERTIFICATE OF SALE

07/18/2014:CERTIFICATE OF SALE

FINAL JUDGMENT FORECLOSURE BOOK 26868 PAGE 1454

06/18/2014:FINAL JUDGMENT FORECLOSURE BOOK 26868 PAGE 1454

ORDER OF DEFAULT

05/15/2014:ORDER OF DEFAULT

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

05/14/2014:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

SERVICE RETURN - NOT SERVED

04/15/2014:SERVICE RETURN - NOT SERVED

COMPLAINT

03/28/2014:COMPLAINT

PLURIES SUMMONS ISSUED

02/27/2013:PLURIES SUMMONS ISSUED

REPLY/RESPONSE

01/15/2013:REPLY/RESPONSE

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/11/2012:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/25/2012:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/25/2012:SUMMONS ISSUED

70 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED MAIL; Notes:MARIA MARICELA ROCHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED MAIL; Notes:TENANT 1 NKA MARCIA SAMPAYO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED MAIL; Notes:Filed by DEFENDANT LUIS A RIVERA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED MAIL; Notes:ERIC VANDERVERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 27278 PAGE 476; Notes:FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF RE-FORECLOSURE E BREGER DTD 01/09/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • REDISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • REDISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED MAIL; Notes:MARIA MARICELA ROCHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER SETTING HEARING; Notes:SPEICAL SET FOR 1/5/15 AT 9:00AM CTR 6K: R OFTEDAL DTD 11/18/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:NOVEMBER 17, 2014 AT 8:45 AM. PLT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF RE-FORECLOSURE. F/B SILVER JADE DEUTCH ESQ Filed By ATTORNEY SILVER JADE DEUTCH

    Read MoreRead Less
111 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2014
  • Due Date:07/23/2014; Description:Civil Doc Stamps PB; Amount Due:$1,615.60; Amount Paid:$1,615.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2014
  • Due Date:07/23/2014; Description:Civil Foreclosure Online Sale Fee; Amount Due:$60.00; Amount Paid:$60.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2014
  • Due Date:07/23/2014; Description:Conversion Registry Posted PB; Amount Due:$1,615.60; Amount Paid:$1,615.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2014
  • Due Date:07/21/2014; Description:Conversion Registry Posted PB; Amount Due:$60.00; Amount Paid:$60.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • Due Date:07/17/2014; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$70.00; Amount Paid:$70.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • Due Date:03/27/2014; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$25.00; Amount Paid:$25.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • Due Date:02/27/2013; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • Due Date:09/27/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$75.00; Amount Paid:$75.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • Due Date:09/27/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • Due Date:09/27/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$1,906.00; Amount Paid:$1,906.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VICTORIA GROVE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where VILLAGE OF ROYAL PALM BEACH FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant