This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 06/18/2022 at 19:02:30 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. V MARTINEZ, BLANCA E

Case Summary

On 05/09/2022 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed an Other lawsuit against MARTINEZ, BLANCA E. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are PARNOFIELLO , JOHN and BURKE , LAUREN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

PARNOFIELLO , JOHN

BURKE , LAUREN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Defendant and Respondent

MARTINEZ , BLANCA E

West Palm Beach, FL 33410-6322

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

PALMA , JORGE

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/09/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

05/09/2022:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/09/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

05/09/2022:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

05/09/2022:DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4458993

05/10/2022:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4458993

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

05/18/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

ANSWER

05/31/2022:ANSWER

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Notes: RESPONSE TO ALLEGATIONS F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE BLANCA E MARTINEZ - 05/17/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4458993; Receipt Amount: $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $310.00; total Amount Paid: $310.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/10/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/10/2022; Description: 400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4458993; Notes: $310.00 4458993 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RJ: County Civil Central - RJ (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes: AS TO DEFENDANT BLANCA E MARTINEZ- E-FILED BY PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: ESERVICE@ANDREUPALMA.COM;KMOEHLE@ANDREUPALMA.COM E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Palma, Jorge L, ESQ.