Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/30/2019 at 15:43:44 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA V LUC, KERMIL

Case Summary

On 09/26/2012 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against LUC, KERMIL. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

BANK OF AMERICA NA

BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC

Defendants and Respondents

LUC, KERMIL

NOEL, PERPETUA

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KERMIL LUC

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF PERPETUA NOEL

TOUSSAINT, ROSE C

ADESKER, YVONETTE

CLERK OF THE CIRCUTI COURT FOR PALM BEACH COUNTY FLORIDA

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

UNKNOWN TENANT #1

UNKNOWN TENANT #2

ADESKER , YVONETTE

LUC , KERMIL

TOUSSAINT , ROSE C

NOEL , PERPETUA

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

TEDESCKO , PATRICE A

YOUSUF , MEHWISH A

SUCHITRA KALE , MEGAN

GARDINER , JACQUELINE

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

COFFMAN ESQ, DENISE L

 

Court Documents

RETURNED MAIL

09/24/2014:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

09/24/2014:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

09/09/2014:RETURNED MAIL

CERTIFICATE OF SALE

09/03/2014:CERTIFICATE OF SALE

NOTICE OF HEARING

07/24/2014:NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

05/16/2014:NOTICE OF HEARING

RETURNED MAIL

03/27/2014:RETURNED MAIL

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

03/19/2014:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT

03/04/2014:AFFIDAVIT

NOTICE

02/28/2014:NOTICE

NOTICE OF ACTION - PUBLICATION

01/14/2013:NOTICE OF ACTION - PUBLICATION

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/11/2013:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/11/2013:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/11/2013:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

AFFIDAVIT

01/10/2013:AFFIDAVIT

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/26/2012:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/26/2012:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/26/2012:SUMMONS ISSUED

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED MAIL; Notes:YVONEHE ADESKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED MAIL; Notes:ROSE C. TOUSAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED MAIL; Notes:YVONETTE ADESKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED MAIL; Notes:ROSE C. TOUSAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED MAIL; Notes:ROSE C. TOUSAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE; Notes:OF DISBURSEMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • CHECK PRINTED; Notes:A Disbursment of $22,800.00 on Check Number 59489 to BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED MAIL; Notes:YVONETRE ADESKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED MAIL; Notes:ROSE C. TOUSAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED MAIL; Notes:YVONETTE ADESKER

    Read MoreRead Less
108 More Docket Entries
  • 09/03/2014
  • Due Date:09/03/2014; Description:Civil Foreclosure Online Sale Fee; Amount Due:$60.00; Amount Paid:$60.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • Due Date:09/03/2014; Description:Civil Conversion Registry Fee; Amount Due:$349.50; Amount Paid:$349.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • Due Date:09/03/2014; Description:Civil Doc Stamps PB; Amount Due:$159.60; Amount Paid:$159.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • Due Date:09/03/2014; Description:Conversion Registry Posted PB; Amount Due:$22,229.10; Amount Paid:$22,229.10; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2014
  • Due Date:09/02/2014; Description:Conversion Registry Posted PB; Amount Due:$1,140.00; Amount Paid:$1,140.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • Due Date:08/29/2014; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$70.00; Amount Paid:$70.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • Due Date:07/25/2014; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$70.00; Amount Paid:$70.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2012
  • Due Date:09/28/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$115.00; Amount Paid:$115.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2012
  • Due Date:09/28/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2012
  • Due Date:09/28/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$906.00; Amount Paid:$906.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Florida Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Bayview Loan Servicing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gardiner, Jacqueline