Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/30/2019 at 16:11:49 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA V JOHNSON, VALRETTA

Case Summary

On 09/27/2012 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JOHNSON, VALRETTA. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BANK OF AMERICA NA

Defendants and Respondents

JOHNSON, VALRETTA

WALKER, RONNIE

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF VALRETTA JOHNSON

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RONNIE WALKER

WALKER, LESHON J

CLERK OF THE COURT IN AND FOR PALM BEACH COUNTY

VISTA CENTER ASSOCIATION INC

VENTURA GREENS AT EMERALD DUNES CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

IMAGE GALLERY & DESIGN INC

CITY OF BOYNTON BEACH

HSBC BANK USA NA

UNKNOWN TENANT I

UNKNOWN TENANT II

WALKER , LESHON J

JOHNSON , VALRETTA

WALKER , RONNIE

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

OSBORNE , DAVID B

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

PETERSON , HAMPTON C

NERETTE ESQ, FARAH

KRAVIT , CORY B

ZACKS , DUSTIN A

 

Court Documents

PAID $70.00 ON RECEIPT 1854741

09/26/2016:PAID $70.00 ON RECEIPT 1854741

MOTION TO RESCHEDULE APRIL 11, 2016 FORECLOSURE SALE FILED BY PLT

05/23/2016:MOTION TO RESCHEDULE APRIL 11, 2016 FORECLOSURE SALE FILED BY PLT

NOTICE

10/01/2015:NOTICE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/29/2015:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL

04/29/2015:ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

02/26/2015:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

NOTICE OF HEARING

09/24/2014:NOTICE OF HEARING

RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

01/17/2014:RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF HEARING

01/16/2014:NOTICE OF HEARING

ORDER

07/16/2013:ORDER

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

06/25/2013:MOTION TO WITHDRAW

REQUEST

10/31/2012:REQUEST

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/18/2012:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/18/2012:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/18/2012:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/27/2012:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/27/2012:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/27/2012:SUMMONS ISSUED

131 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED MAIL; Notes:LESHON J WALKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED MAIL; Notes:VISTA CENTER ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED MAIL; Notes:AS TO VISTA CENTER ASSOC INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • FORECLOSURE CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT; Notes:SERVEALAW@ALBERTELLILAW.COM; DUSTIN@KNZLAW.COM; GM@MANCEBOLAW.COM; FNERETTE@CITYATTY.COM; HPETERSON@MYPALMBEACHCLERK.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF TITLE; Notes:ISSUED TO BANK OF AMERICA BK 28653 PG 0281

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • FORECLOSURE CERTIFICATE OF SALE; Notes:SOLD TO BANK OF AMERICA NA SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING LP FKA COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS SERVICING LP FOR $179,300.00 DUSTIN@KNZLAW.COM;GM@MANCEBOLAW.COM;FNERETTE@CITYATTY.COM;SRENNIE@CITYATTY.COM;SERVEALAW@ALBERTELLILAW.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • FORECLOSURE FEES ADDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAID $1,315.10 ON RECEIPT 1863653; Notes:$1,315.10 1863653 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • FORECLOSURE PROCESS SALE; Notes:1 179300.00 478826.64 SALE 2016-10-04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAID $70.00 ON RECEIPT 1854741; Notes:$70.00 1854741 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
153 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2012
  • Receipt Number:CAMB715486; Receipt Amount: $120.40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • Receipt Number:CAMB715486; Receipt Amount: $1,926.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$3,500.70; total Amount Paid:$3,500.70; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • Due Date:10/04/2016; Description:Civil Doc Stamps PB; Amount Due:$1,255.10; Amount Paid:$1,255.10; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • Due Date:10/04/2016; Description:Civil Foreclosure Online Sale Fee; Amount Due:$60.00; Amount Paid:$60.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • Due Date:09/27/2016; Description:CA Foreclosure Sale Fee; Amount Due:$70.00; Amount Paid:$70.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • Due Date:05/24/2016; Description:108FF Reopen $50 PB; Amount Due:$50.00; Amount Paid:$50.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • Due Date:09/27/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$154.00; Amount Paid:$154.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • Due Date:09/27/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$1,906.00; Amount Paid:$1,906.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • Due Date:09/27/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VISTA CENTER ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where HSBC Bank USA, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zacks, Dustin A