This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/07/2023 at 16:40:57 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA N.A. V ALLEN, CHAD L

Case Summary

On 12/22/2022 BANK OF AMERICA N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALLEN, CHAD L. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHULLMAN , SARAH L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHULLMAN , SARAH L

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

Defendant and Respondent

ALLEN , CHAD L

West Palm Beach, FL 33406

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

KUNDAWALA , JOY LYNN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/22/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

12/22/2022:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS REQUESTED

12/22/2022:SUMMONS REQUESTED

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD COUNSEL OF RECORD

12/22/2022:NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD COUNSEL OF RECORD

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4721203

12/22/2022:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4721203

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/22/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/11/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

01/26/2023:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

ORDER OF DISMISSAL

01/26/2023:ORDER OF DISMISSAL

STIPULATION

01/26/2023:STIPULATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2023
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location: MB; Room: 6M (Main Branch); Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION; Notes: FOR PAYMENT F/B PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 34097 PAGE 1699-1698; Notes: ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR PAYMENT AND DISMISSAL JUDGE SHULLMAN 1/26/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes: PARTIES PRESENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketDISMISSED AFTER HEARING; Notes: DA - DISMISSED AFTER HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE & COSTS SUBSTITUTE CHAD L ALLEN - 01/06/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4721203; Receipt Amount: $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $310.00; total Amount Paid: $310.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 12/22/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 12/22/2022; Description: 400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: FLORIDA@COOLINGWINTER.COM E ISSUED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 1/26/2023 10:30 AM SHULLMAN, SARAH L; Notes: SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 1/26/2023 10:30 AM SHULLMAN, SARAH L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4721203; Notes: $310.00 4721203 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD COUNSEL OF RECORD; Notes: OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD COUNSEL OF RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RE: County Civil Central - RE (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less