This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/05/2023 at 15:21:24 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. V AHMED, JAMAL U

Case Summary

On 01/24/2023 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AHMED, JAMAL U. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GARRISON , EDWARD A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GARRISON , EDWARD A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Respondent and Defendant

AHMED , JAMAL U

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

STERN , DANA M

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/24/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

01/24/2023:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS REQUESTED

01/24/2023:SUMMONS REQUESTED

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4755723

01/25/2023:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4755723

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/25/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/03/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 34157 PAGE 1199-1199

03/01/2023:ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 34157 PAGE 1199-1199

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 34157 PAGE 1199-1199; Notes: SIGNED BY JUDGE GARRISON ON 2/28/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketDISMISSED AFTER HEARING; Notes: DA - DISMISSED AFTER HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location: MB; Room: 6K (Main Branch); Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED JAMAL U AHMED - 02/03/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4755723; Receipt Amount: $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $310.00; total Amount Paid: $310.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/25/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/25/2023; Description: 400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: ESERVICE@HAYTFLA.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 2/28/2023 1:15 PM GARRISON, EDWARD A; Notes: SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 2/28/2023 1:15 PM GARRISON, EDWARD A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4755723; Notes: $310.00 4755723 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RL: County Civil Central - RL (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: FOR DAMAGES F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less