Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/30/2019 at 14:04:29 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO BAC HOME LOANS V ASA, STEVEN M

Case Summary

On 09/20/2012 BANK OF AMERICA NA SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO BAC HOME LOANS filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ASA, STEVEN M. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BANK OF AMERICA NA SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO BAC HOME LOANS

Defendants and Respondents

ASA, STEVEN M

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF STEVEN M ASA AKA STEVEN ASA

WELLS FARGO BANK NA SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO WACHOVIA BANK NA

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK

MONTREUX COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN TENANT #1

UNKNOWN TENANT #2

UNKNOWN TENANT #3

UNKNOWN TENANT #4

ASA , STEVEN M

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MAYLOR , SUZETTE A

BARBACCIA ESQ, SARAH M

BLANCO , ALICE

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

LEE ESQ, JOSEPH DOUGLAS

ROSSIN ESQ, THOMAS E

SNYDER , PETER J

 

Court Documents

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

08/10/2015:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

MOTION

04/16/2015:MOTION

MOTION

04/16/2015:MOTION

STIPULATION

04/14/2014:STIPULATION

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

04/08/2014:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

NOTICE OF SERVICE

03/18/2014:NOTICE OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF HEARING

02/07/2014:NOTICE OF HEARING

ORDER

06/18/2013:ORDER

AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES

04/02/2013:AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

03/11/2013:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

ORDER GRANTING

11/27/2012:ORDER GRANTING

NOTICE OF HEARING

11/26/2012:NOTICE OF HEARING

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

11/01/2012:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

11/01/2012:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

10/16/2012:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/21/2012:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/21/2012:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/21/2012:SUMMONS ISSUED

98 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:ROD UNDELSON, WRIT POSTED 9/10/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED; Notes:TO 12873 PENNELL PINES ROAD BOYNTON BEACH FL 33436 TO BANK OF AMERICA NA PBSO-EDW WPO-15-004594 Filed by DEFENDANT STEVEN M ASA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING; Notes:MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION CLERK SHALL ENTER WRIT OF POSSESSION P BLANC DTD 08/27/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • REDISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT; Notes:A Payment of -$50.00 was made on receipt CAMB1017609.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • CAFF/REOPEN ($50.00); Notes:Filed by PLAINTIFF BANK OF AMERICA NA SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO BAC HOME LOANS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • REOPEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes:AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE (DFT STEVEN M ASA A/K/A STEVEN ASA) FILED BY PLT Filed by PLAINTIFF BANK OF AMERICA NA SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO BAC HOME LOANS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE -NAME/ADDRESS CHANGE; Notes:NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM NAME AND NEW DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PER RULE 2.516 Filed By ATTORNEY ALICE BLANCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:ON AUGUST 27, 2015 AT 8:45 AM FILED BY PLT Filed by PLAINTIFF BANK OF AMERICA NA SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO BAC HOME LOANS

    Read MoreRead Less
143 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2015
  • Due Date:08/14/2015; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$50.00; Amount Paid:$50.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • Due Date:06/25/2015; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$50.00; Amount Paid:$0.00; Amount Balance:$50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • Due Date:04/29/2015; Description:Civil Doc Stamps PB; Amount Due:$350.70; Amount Paid:$350.70; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • Due Date:04/29/2015; Description:Civil Foreclosure Online Sale Fee; Amount Due:$60.00; Amount Paid:$60.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • Due Date:04/29/2015; Description:Conversion Registry Posted PB; Amount Due:$410.70; Amount Paid:$410.70; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2015
  • Due Date:04/24/2015; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$70.00; Amount Paid:$70.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • Due Date:03/16/2015; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$50.00; Amount Paid:$50.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2012
  • Due Date:09/25/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$92.50; Amount Paid:$92.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2012
  • Due Date:09/25/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2012
  • Due Date:09/25/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$1,906.00; Amount Paid:$1,906.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Express Centurion Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SNYDER , PETER J