Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/12/2021 at 17:32:27 (UTC).

BAL, RACHHPAL

Case Summary

On 06/07/2021 BAL, RACHHPAL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MARTZ , JAMES L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MARTZ , JAMES L

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BAL , JASWANT S

Decedent

BAL , RACHHPAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SCHWARTZ , ROBERT D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4090185; Receipt Amount: $9.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$355.00; total Amount Paid:$355.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:07/02/2021; Description:CP Probate Service Charges PB 01262020; Amount Due:$9.00; Amount Paid:$9.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketPAID $9.00 ON RECEIPT 4090185; Notes:$9.00 4090185 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL; Notes:TO PROBATE; JUDGE JAMES L MARTZ - DTD 6/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketDISPOSED BY JUDGE; Notes:DJ - DISPOSED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketREPRESENTATIVE ATTORNEY: SCHWARTZ, ROBERT D; Notes:REPRESENTATIVE ATTORNEY: SCHWARTZ, ROBERT D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketPETITIONER: BAL, JASWANT S; Notes:Petitioner: BAL, JASWANT S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketORDER SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION BOOK 32654 PAGE 949-949; Notes:JUDGE JAMES L MARTZ - DTD 6/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketWILL BOOK 32654 PAGE 1085-1090; Notes:F/B ATTY. SCHWARTZ OBO PETR JASWANT S. BAL ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:06/09/2021; Description:502FF Summary Administration $1000 or more; Amount Due:$346.00; Amount Paid:$346.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketPAID $346.00 ON RECEIPT 4058159; Notes:$346.00 4058159 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:IY: South Branch Probate - IY (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT; Notes:COPY F/B PETR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketWILL; Notes:COPY F/B PETR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketPAID FUNERAL BILL; Notes:F/B PETR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketDECLARATION; Notes:OF TRUST BENEFICIARIES F/B ATTY SCHWARTZ OBO PETR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Notes:CONCERNING CRIMINAL HISTORY F/B JASWANT S BAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Notes:F/B JASWANT S BAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMIN; Notes:F/B PETR, RACHHPAL K BAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHWARTZ , ROBERT D