This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 02/25/2022 at 22:40:45 (UTC).

AYOUB, WADIA V IHOP RESTAURANTS LLC

Case Summary

On 08/16/2021 AYOUB, WADIA filed an Other lawsuit against IHOP RESTAURANTS LLC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KEYSER , JANIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KEYSER , JANIS

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

AYOUB , WADIA

Defendants and Respondents

IHOP RESTAURANTS LLC

SUNSHINE RESTAURANT HOLDINGS LLC

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/16/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

08/16/2021:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/16/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/16/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

08/16/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

08/16/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/16/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/16/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/16/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4142383

08/17/2021:PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4142383

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

08/26/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

08/26/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

ORDER IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

02/21/2022:ORDER IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN; Notes:KEYSER DTD 02/21/2022: DEMAND FOR JURY AND THIS CASE IS DESIGNATED TO GENERAL TRACK FOR TIME TO DISPOSITION UNLESS ALL DFT(S) HAVE BEEN DEFAULTED AND/OR DROPPED. *** SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS ***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED SUNSHINE RESTAURANT HOLDINGS, LLC - 08/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE IHOP RESTAURANTS LLC - 8/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4142383; Receipt Amount: $421.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$421.00; total Amount Paid:$421.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:08/17/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:08/17/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:08/17/2021; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4142383; Notes:$421.00 4142383 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AB: Circuit Civil Central - AB (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:(FIRST) TO DEFT IHOP RESTAURANTS LLC; F/B PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:(FIRST) TO DEFT SUNSHINE RESTAURANT HOLDINGS LLC; F/B PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:(FIRST) TO DEFT IHOP RESTAURANTS LLC; F/B PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:TO DEFT IHOP RESTAURANTS LLC; F/B PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:TO DEFT SUNSHINE RESTAURANT HOLDINGS LLC; F/B PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:grandab@ctllawyers.com;camachoj@ctllawyers.com;camachoj@ctllawyers.com IHOP RESTAURANTS LLC SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:grandab@ctllawyers.com;camachoj@ctllawyers.com;camachoj@ctllawyers.com SUNSHINE RESTAURANT HOLDINGS LLC SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:FB PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IHOP Restaurants, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SUNSHINE RESTAURANT HOLDINGS LLC is a litigant