This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 02/26/2022 at 13:05:53 (UTC).

ATLAS MEDICAL AND ORTHOPEDICS LLC A/A/O GABRIELLE PLAISIR V PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/11/2022 ATLAS MEDICAL AND ORTHOPEDICS LLC A/A/O GABRIELLE PLAISIR filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CORLEW , REGINALD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CORLEW , REGINALD

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

ATLAS MEDICAL AND ORTHOPEDICS LLC

ATLAS MEDICAL AND ORTHOPEDICS LLC A/A/O GABRIELLE PLAISIR

Defendant and Respondent

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FADERANI , RAV

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/11/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/11/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/11/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

PAID $55.00 ON RECEIPT 4310250

01/12/2022:PAID $55.00 ON RECEIPT 4310250

SUMMONS REQUESTED

01/17/2022:SUMMONS REQUESTED

PAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 4316880

01/19/2022:PAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 4316880

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/19/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/08/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

02/17/2022:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2022
  • HearingCANCELLED - SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location:SB; Room:ZOOM PIP Pre-Trial (South Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketCancelled SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP on 3/1/2022 9:30:00 AM due to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketDISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Notes:DB - DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes:WITH PREJUDICE F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SUBSTITUTE PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY - 01/27/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4316880; Receipt Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$75.00; total Amount Paid:$75.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • FinancialDue Date:01/19/2022; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • FinancialDue Date:01/19/2022; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:ATLANTISLEGALGROUP@GMAIL.COM E ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 4316880; Notes:$20.00 4316880 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4310250; Receipt Amount: $55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • FinancialDue Date:01/12/2022; Description:403FF County Civil Claim < $100; Amount Due:$55.00; Amount Paid:$55.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 3/1/2022 9:30 AM CORLEW, REGINALD; Notes:SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 3/1/2022 9:30 AM CORLEW, REGINALD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $55.00 ON RECEIPT 4310250; Notes:$55.00 4310250 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RD: South Branch County Civil Division - RD (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Atlas Medical and Orthopedics, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FADERANI , RAV