This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 11/02/2021 at 19:12:34 (UTC).

ATLAS MEDICAL AND ORTHOPEDICS LLC AAO WOLSON BERNECHE V THE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/28/2021 ATLAS MEDICAL AND ORTHOPEDICS LLC AAO WOLSON BERNECHE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against THE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CORLEW , REGINALD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CORLEW , REGINALD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ATLAS MEDICAL AND ORTHOPEDICS LLC AAO WOLSON BERNECHE

Defendant and Respondent

THE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FADERANI , RAY

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

10/26/2021:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/29/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4193354

09/29/2021:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4193354

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/28/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/28/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/28/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2021
  • HearingCANCELLED - SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location:SB; Room:ZOOM PIP Pre-Trial (South Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCancelled SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP on 11/9/2021 9:30:00 AM due to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketDISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Notes:DB - DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes:WITH PREJUDICE. F/B PLT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4193354; Receipt Amount: $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$310.00; total Amount Paid:$310.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:09/29/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:09/29/2021; Description:400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due:$300.00; Amount Paid:$300.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:ATLANTISLEGALGROUP@GMAIL.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 11/9/2021 9:30 AM CORLEW, REGINALD; Notes:SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 11/9/2021 9:30 AM CORLEW, REGINALD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4193354; Notes:$310.00 4193354 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RD: South Branch County Civil Division - RD (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes:FOR DAMAGES F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Atlas Medical and Orthopedics, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where General Insurance Company Of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FADERANI , RAY