This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 02/25/2022 at 06:45:37 (UTC).

ATLAS MEDICAL AND ORTHOPEDICS LLC AAO WILEME DORCEUS V PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/02/2021 ATLAS MEDICAL AND ORTHOPEDICS LLC AAO WILEME DORCEUS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRYSON , MARNI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRYSON , MARNI

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

ATLAS MEDICAL AND ORTHOPEDICS LLC AAO WILEME DORCEUS

Defendant and Respondent

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

FADERANI , RAY

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/02/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/02/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/02/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4235907

11/03/2021:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4235907

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/03/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

12/15/2021:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes:PLAINTIFF PRESENT, DEFENDANT PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location:SB; Room:ZOOM PIP Pre-Trial (South Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4235907; Receipt Amount: $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$310.00; total Amount Paid:$310.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:11/03/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:11/03/2021; Description:400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due:$300.00; Amount Paid:$300.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:ATLANTISLEGALGROUP@GMAIL.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 12/14/2021 9:30 AM BRYSON, MARNI; Notes:SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 12/14/2021 9:30 AM BRYSON, MARNI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4235907; Notes:$310.00 4235907 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RS: South Branch County Civil Division - RS (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes:FOR DAMAGES F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Atlas Medical and Orthopedics, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant