This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 02/25/2022 at 10:02:53 (UTC).

ATLAS MEDICAL AND ORTHOPEDICS LLC AAO JAYSON RENE V PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/04/2021 ATLAS MEDICAL AND ORTHOPEDICS LLC AAO JAYSON RENE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRYSON , MARNI. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRYSON , MARNI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ATLAS MEDICAL AND ORTHOPEDICS LLC AAO JAYSON RENE

Defendant and Respondent

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FADERANI , RAY

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

DORT ESQ, WHITNEY

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/04/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/04/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/04/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

PAID $90.00 ON RECEIPT 4237927

11/05/2021:PAID $90.00 ON RECEIPT 4237927

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/05/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

12/13/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

12/15/2021:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

12/28/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

01/10/2022:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

01/11/2022:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

02/10/2022:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketDISMISSED AFTER HEARING; Notes:DA - DISMISSED AFTER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes:WITHOUT PREJUDICE F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes:FB DFT- TO FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:F/B WHITNEY E DORT OBO DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes:PLAINTIFF NOT PRESENT, DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location:SB; Room:ZOOM PIP Pre-Trial (South Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY - 12/10/2024

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4237927; Receipt Amount: $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$90.00; total Amount Paid:$90.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:11/05/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:11/05/2021; Description:402FF County Civil Claim > $100 < $500; Amount Due:$80.00; Amount Paid:$80.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:ATLANTISLEGALGROUP@GMAIL.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 12/14/2021 9:30 AM BRYSON, MARNI; Notes:SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 12/14/2021 9:30 AM BRYSON, MARNI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $90.00 ON RECEIPT 4237927; Notes:$90.00 4237927 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RS: South Branch County Civil Division - RS (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes:FOR DAMAGES F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Atlas Medical and Orthopedics, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FADERANI , RAY