This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 12/01/2021 at 19:06:00 (UTC).

ATLAS MEDICAL AND ORTHOPEDICS LLC AAO HAGAN ANOZARD V SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICE INC

Case Summary

On 10/27/2021 ATLAS MEDICAL AND ORTHOPEDICS LLC AAO HAGAN ANOZARD filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICE INC. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CORLEW , REGINALD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CORLEW , REGINALD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ATLAS MEDICAL AND ORTHOPEDICS LLC AAO HAGAN ANOZARD

Defendant and Respondent

SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICE INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FADERANI , RAY

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/27/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/27/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

10/27/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4228604

10/28/2021:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4228604

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/28/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2021
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location:SB; Room:ZOOM PIP Pre-Trial (South Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4228604; Receipt Amount: $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$310.00; total Amount Paid:$310.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:10/28/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:10/28/2021; Description:400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due:$300.00; Amount Paid:$300.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:ATLANTISLEGALGROUP@GMAIL.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 12/7/2021 9:30 AM CORLEW, REGINALD; Notes:SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 12/7/2021 9:30 AM CORLEW, REGINALD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4228604; Notes:$310.00 4228604 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RD: South Branch County Civil Division - RD (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes:FOR DAMAGES F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Atlas Medical and Orthopedics, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. THIRD-PARTY ADMINISTRATOR INSURED BY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FADERANI , RAY