This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 08/02/2022 at 22:50:40 (UTC).

ARVEST CENTRAL MORTGAGE COMPANY V CALAFIORE, JOSEPH SALVATORE

Case Summary

On 06/22/2022 ARVEST CENTRAL MORTGAGE COMPANY filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CALAFIORE, JOSEPH SALVATORE. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KASTRENAKES , JOHN S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KASTRENAKES , JOHN S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ARVEST CENTRAL MORTGAGE COMPANY

Defendants and Respondents

CALAFIORE , JOSEPH SALVATORE

LEONE , MARIA

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOSEPH SALVATORE CALAFIORE

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MARIA LEONE

UNKNOWN TENANTS OWNERS 1

UNKNOWN TENANTS OWNERS 2

UNKNOWN TENANTS OWNERS 3

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SCOTT , JENNIFER MOUSER

 

Court Documents

LIS PENDENS

06/22/2022:LIS PENDENS

LETTER

07/22/2022:LETTER

ORDER J KASTRENAKES DTD 7/18/2022 THE MOTION IS GRANTED. CHRISTINE FORAN, BRIAN SULLIVAN AND SANDRA YADE OF CONNECTICUT PROCESS SERVING, LLC IS CONSTITUTED AND APPOINTED AS PROCESS SERVER IN THE ABOVE CAUSE FOR THE PURPOSE OF SERVING THE INITIAL PLEA

07/19/2022:ORDER J KASTRENAKES DTD 7/18/2022 THE MOTION IS GRANTED. CHRISTINE FORAN, BRIAN SULLIVAN AND SANDRA YADE OF CONNECTICUT PROCESS SERVING, LLC IS CONSTITUTED AND APPOINTED AS PROCESS SERVER IN THE ABOVE CAUSE FOR THE PURPOSE OF SERVING THE INITIAL PLEADING. THE PROCESS SERVER SHALL MAKE PROOF OF SERVICE BY AFFIDAVIT PROMPTLY AND IN ANY EVENT W/IN THE TIME DURING WHICH THE PERSON SERVED MUST RESPOND TO THE PROCESS.

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

07/12/2022:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/27/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/27/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/27/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/27/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/27/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $970.60 ON RECEIPT 4514211

06/26/2022:PAID $970.60 ON RECEIPT 4514211

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/22/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED AT THE END OF THE SUMMONS

06/22/2022:~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED AT THE END OF THE SUMMONS

~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED AT THE END OF THE SUMMONS

06/22/2022:~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED AT THE END OF THE SUMMONS

~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED AT THE END OF THE SUMMONS

06/22/2022:~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED AT THE END OF THE SUMMONS

~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED AT THE END OF THE SUMMONS

06/22/2022:~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED AT THE END OF THE SUMMONS

~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED AT THE END OF THE SUMMONS

06/22/2022:~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED AT THE END OF THE SUMMONS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

06/22/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

COMPLAINT

06/22/2022:COMPLAINT

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER; Notes: F/B JOSEPH CALAFIORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER J KASTRENAKES DTD 7/18/2022 THE MOTION IS GRANTED. CHRISTINE FORAN, BRIAN SULLIVAN AND SANDRA YADE OF CONNECTICUT PROCESS SERVING, LLC IS CONSTITUTED AND APPOINTED AS PROCESS SERVER IN THE ABOVE CAUSE FOR THE PURPOSE OF SERVING THE INITIAL PLEADING. THE PROCESS SERVER SHALL MAKE PROOF OF SERVICE BY AFFIDAVIT PROMPTLY AND IN ANY EVENT W/IN THE TIME DURING WHICH THE PERSON SERVED MUST RESPOND TO THE PROCESS.; Notes: J KASTRENAKES DTD 7/18/2022 THE MOTION IS GRANTED. CHRISTINE FORAN, BRIAN SULLIVAN AND SANDRA YADE OF CONNECTICUT PROCESS SERVING, LLC IS CONSTITUTED AND APPOINTED AS PROCESS SERVER IN THE ABOVE CAUSE FOR THE PURPOSE OF SERVING THE INITIAL PLEADING. THE PROCESS SERVER SHALL MAKE PROOF OF SERVICE BY AFFIDAVIT PROMPTLY AND IN ANY EVENT W/IN THE TIME DURING WHICH THE PERSON SERVED MUST RESPOND TO THE PROCESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER; Notes: TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: EPORTAL@KASSLAW.COM AS TO DFT UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOSEPH SALVATORE CALAFIORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: EPORTAL@KASSLAW.COM AS TO DFT UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: EPORTAL@KASSLAW.COM AS TO DFT UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MARIA LEONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: EPORTAL@KASSLAW.COM AS TO DFT MARIA LEONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: EPORTAL@KASSLAW.COM AS TO DFT JOSEPH SALVATORE CALAFIORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4514211; Receipt Amount: $970.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $970.60; total Amount Paid: $970.60; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED AT THE END OF THE SUMMONS; Notes: eportal@kasslaw.com STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED AT THE END OF THE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED AT THE END OF THE SUMMONS; Notes: eportal@kasslaw.com STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED AT THE END OF THE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED AT THE END OF THE SUMMONS; Notes: eportal@kasslaw.com STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED AT THE END OF THE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED AT THE END OF THE SUMMONS; Notes: eportal@kasslaw.com STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED AT THE END OF THE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED AT THE END OF THE SUMMONS; Notes: eportal@kasslaw.com STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED AT THE END OF THE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM. F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 33666 PAGE 1923-1923; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: VERIFIED MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT. F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARVEST CENTRAL MORTGAGE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott, Jennifer Mouser