This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 05/23/2019 at 15:14:48 (UTC).

ARMSTRONG AND ARMSTRONG LLC V HENRIQUEZ, SONIA E CASTILLO

Case Summary

On 04/18/2019 ARMSTRONG AND ARMSTRONG LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against HENRIQUEZ, SONIA E CASTILLO. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ZUCKERMAN , ASHLEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ZUCKERMAN , ASHLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ARMSTRONG AND ARMSTRONG LLC

Defendant and Respondent

HENRIQUEZ , SONIA E CASTILLO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BOSTWICK , ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 30614 PAGE 83-83

05/14/2019:FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 30614 PAGE 83-83

CLERK'S DEFAULT

05/08/2019:CLERK'S DEFAULT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

05/04/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

05/04/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

05/04/2019:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

04/25/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

04/22/2019:NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/22/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 3133430

04/22/2019:PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 3133430

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

04/18/2019:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2019
  • DISPOSED BY DEFAULT; Notes:DD - DISPOSED BY DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 30614 PAGE 83-83; Notes:OF EVICTION DTD 05/13/19 ZUCKERMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S DEFAULT; Notes:TKBOSTWICK@GMAIL.COM SONIA E CASTILLO HENRIQUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes:FB PLT/ RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:SERVED ON SONLA E. CASTILLO HENRIQUEZ ON 4/23/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes:FB PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY; Notes:F/B PLTS ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:TKBOSTWICK@GMAIL.COM E ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 3133430; Notes:$195.00 3133430 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RE: County Civil Central - RE (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Receipt Number:3133430; Receipt Amount: $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$195.00; total Amount Paid:$195.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Due Date:04/22/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Due Date:04/22/2019; Description:401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due:$185.00; Amount Paid:$185.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARMSTRONG & ARMSTRONG is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOSTWICK, ANTHONY