This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 08/01/2019 at 15:07:15 (UTC).

ARISSA PLACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC V RH JERSEY BOY INC

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 ARISSA PLACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against RH JERSEY BOY INC. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, West County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLLINS , SHERRI L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-WB

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLLINS , SHERRI L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ARISSA PLACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

Respondents and Defendants

HART , LOURDES

UNKNOWN TENANT

HART , PETER

RH JERSEY BOY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

POSNER , CHRISTOPHER B

 

Court Documents

PAID $0.60 ON RECEIPT 3264163

07/25/2019:PAID $0.60 ON RECEIPT 3264163

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/18/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

07/08/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/03/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/03/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/03/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/27/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/27/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/27/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

07/25/2019:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

PAID $0.60 ON RECEIPT 3241047

07/09/2019:PAID $0.60 ON RECEIPT 3241047

RESPONSE TO: EVICTION COMPLAINT F/B DFT

07/09/2019:RESPONSE TO: EVICTION COMPLAINT F/B DFT

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/27/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $325.00 ON RECEIPT 3227203

06/27/2019:PAID $325.00 ON RECEIPT 3227203

COMPLAINT FOR EVICT & DAMAGES

06/27/2019:COMPLAINT FOR EVICT & DAMAGES

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/27/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/27/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/27/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAID $0.60 ON RECEIPT 3264163; Notes:$0.60 3264163 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:FILED BY ALL DFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED RH JERSEY BOY, INC - 07/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAID $0.60 ON RECEIPT 3241047; Notes:$0.60 3241047 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO: EVICTION COMPLAINT F/B DFT; Notes:EVICTION COMPLAINT F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAID $255.00 ON RECEIPT 3227203; Notes:$255.00 3227203 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2019
  • Due Date:07/25/2019; Description:CC County Civil Service Charges PB; Amount Due:$0.60; Amount Paid:$0.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Due Date:07/09/2019; Description:CC County Civil Service Charges PB; Amount Due:$0.60; Amount Paid:$0.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Due Date:06/27/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Due Date:06/27/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Due Date:06/27/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Due Date:06/27/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Due Date:06/27/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Due Date:06/27/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Due Date:06/27/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Due Date:06/27/2019; Description:401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due:$185.00; Amount Paid:$185.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer POSNER , CHRISTOPHER B