This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 11/27/2019 at 15:18:15 (UTC).

AQUINO, LYNNE V SHULTZ, SHAWN

Case Summary

On 10/23/2019 AQUINO, LYNNE filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against SHULTZ, SHAWN. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, North County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CASTOR , FRANK S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-NB

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CASTOR , FRANK S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

AQUINO , LYNNE

Defendants and Respondents

LENNON , TIFFANY

SHULTZ , SHAWN

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY IN PART SIGNED BY JUDGE CASTOR ON 11/21/19

11/21/2019:ORDER GRANTING EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY IN PART SIGNED BY JUDGE CASTOR ON 11/21/19

EMERGENCY MOTION

11/21/2019:EMERGENCY MOTION

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

11/18/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 31017 PAGE 1373-1374

11/07/2019:FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 31017 PAGE 1373-1374

NOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

11/07/2019:NOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

11/07/2019:MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

11/07/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

ORDER DIRECTING DFTS TO DEPOSIT FUNDS INTO THE COURT REGISTRY $ 1700 BY 4PM ON 11/5/19-JUDGE CASTOR DTD 10/29/19

10/29/2019:ORDER DIRECTING DFTS TO DEPOSIT FUNDS INTO THE COURT REGISTRY $ 1700 BY 4PM ON 11/5/19-JUDGE CASTOR DTD 10/29/19

PAID $0.30 ON RECEIPT 3392803

10/28/2019:PAID $0.30 ON RECEIPT 3392803

ANSWER

10/28/2019:ANSWER

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/28/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/28/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

PAID $208.40 ON RECEIPT 3384546

10/23/2019:PAID $208.40 ON RECEIPT 3384546

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

10/23/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

10/23/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/23/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

10/23/2019:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/23/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY IN PART SIGNED BY JUDGE CASTOR ON 11/21/19; Notes:EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY IN PART SIGNED BY JUDGE CASTOR ON 11/21/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EMERGENCY MOTION; Notes:F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DISPOSED BY JUDGE; Notes:DJ - DISPOSED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 31017 PAGE 1373-1374; Notes:EVICTION JUDGE CASTOR ON 11/7/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Notes:RESIDENTIAL EVICTION. FB PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAID $2.00 ON RECEIPT 3407045; Notes:$2.00 3407045 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DIRECTING DFTS TO DEPOSIT FUNDS INTO THE COURT REGISTRY $ 1700 BY 4PM ON 11/5/19-JUDGE CASTOR DTD 10/29/19; Notes:DIRECTING DFTS TO DEPOSIT FUNDS INTO THE COURT REGISTRY $ 1700 BY 4PM ON 11/5/19-JUDGE CASTOR DTD 10/29/19

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2019
  • DIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RH: North Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RH (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • Receipt Number:3407045; Receipt Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • Receipt Number:3392803; Receipt Amount: $0.30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • Receipt Number:3384546; Receipt Amount: $208.40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$210.70; total Amount Paid:$210.70; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • Due Date:11/07/2019; Description:CC County Civil Service Charges PB; Amount Due:$2.00; Amount Paid:$2.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • Due Date:10/28/2019; Description:CC County Civil Service Charges PB; Amount Due:$0.30; Amount Paid:$0.30; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • Due Date:10/23/2019; Description:401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due:$185.00; Amount Paid:$185.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • Due Date:10/23/2019; Description:CC County Civil Service Charges PB; Amount Due:$3.40; Amount Paid:$3.40; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • Due Date:10/23/2019; Description:Summons $10.00; Amount Due:$20.00; Amount Paid:$20.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less