This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 10/11/2021 at 19:47:15 (UTC).

ANTONIADIS, DENISE V HOLMBERG, KELLY

Case Summary

On 09/06/2021 ANTONIADIS, DENISE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HOLMBERG, KELLY. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KASTRENAKES , JOHN S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KASTRENAKES , JOHN S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ANTONIADIS , DENISE

Defendants, Counter Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Respondents

HOLMBERG , KELLY

ANTONIADIS , DENISE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

CHAPMAN , AVERY S

Defendant, Counter Plaintiff, Petitioner and Respondent Attorneys

CARTAYA ESQ, CARMEN Y

SINGER , IAN P

CHAPMAN , AVERY S

 

Court Documents

PAID $395.00 ON RECEIPT 4198436

10/04/2021:PAID $395.00 ON RECEIPT 4198436

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

09/30/2021:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

09/15/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

09/14/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/08/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4166735

09/08/2021:PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4166735

~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED INCORRECT DEFENDANT NAME; PLEASE CORRECT AND RE-SUBMIT

09/06/2021:~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED INCORRECT DEFENDANT NAME; PLEASE CORRECT AND RE-SUBMIT

COMPLAINT

09/06/2021:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/06/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4198436; Receipt Amount: $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$806.00; total Amount Paid:$806.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:10/04/2021; Description:8CTP CA General Cross Counter 3rd Party PB_070117; Amount Due:$395.00; Amount Paid:$395.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $395.00 ON RECEIPT 4198436; Notes:$395.00 4198436 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:AND COUNTER CLAIM F/B DF/COUNTER PLT KELLY HOLMBERG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:SERVED KELLY HOLMBERG 9-13-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED KELLY HOLMBERG - 09/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4166735; Receipt Amount: $411.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:09/08/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:09/08/2021; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:asc@chapmanlawgroup.net;lpn@chapmanlawgroup.net;teh@chapmanlawgroup.net AS TO DFT KELLY HOLMBERG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4166735; Notes:$411.00 4166735 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AF: Circuit Civil Central - AF (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED INCORRECT DEFENDANT NAME; PLEASE CORRECT AND RE-SUBMIT; Notes:asc@chapmanlawgroup.net;lpn@chapmanlawgroup.net;teh@chapmanlawgroup.net INCORRECT DEFENDANT NAME; PLEASE CORRECT AND RE-SUBMIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:FB PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHAPMAN , AVERY S