Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 04/28/2021 at 10:34:00 (UTC).

ANNE M GANNON TAX COLLECTOR PALM BEACH COUNTY V R AND B TENNIS HOLDINGS LLC

Case Summary

On 05/08/2020 ANNE M GANNON TAX COLLECTOR PALM BEACH COUNTY filed an Other lawsuit against R AND B TENNIS HOLDINGS LLC. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COATES JR, HOWARD K. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COATES JR, HOWARD K

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ANNE M GANNON TAX COLLECTOR PALM BEACH COUNTY

Defendants and Respondents

JO ANN FRANCIS MEDICAL ESTHETICS

SECRET PALATE LLC

YELLOWTAIL MODERN ASIAN CUISINE

SOZO WELLNESS

BUILD A BEAR WORKSHOP

DORRIANS WEST PALM

BLINKBIO INC

ME SHEN THAI AND SUSHI BAR

REDWING FARMS LLC

HEALTHTRUST WORKFORCE SOLUTIONS

BRAZILIAN WAX SPA

DAWG GONE GOOD GROOMING

AMELIA ESTATES

LASER LIGHT LLC

RANCHO CHICO

TOO BIZARRE 107

K & S AG ENTERPRISES LLC

FURNITURE DIRECT LIQUIDATION WAREHOUSE

FUNCTIONAL 45 TRAINING

2,050 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MAYOR , ORFELIA M

Other Attorneys

PELLGRINO , TARA SUZANNE

 

Court Documents

PETITION

06/08/2020:PETITION

RETURNED MAIL

02/08/2021:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

11/10/2020:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

10/14/2020:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

10/01/2020:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

09/29/2020:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

09/29/2020:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

09/29/2020:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

09/25/2020:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

09/23/2020:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

09/23/2020:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

09/22/2020:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

09/22/2020:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

09/17/2020:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

09/14/2020:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

09/14/2020:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

09/14/2020:RETURNED MAIL

PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 3624237

05/11/2020:PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 3624237

400 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Notes:NATIONWIDE LABORATORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Notes:BODYOLOGY AESTHETICS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Notes:MLD TO LUCKYS ARCADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Notes:AIROSEA MARINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Notes:AIROSEA MARINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Notes:MARCELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Notes:MARCELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Notes:MLD TO OXXO CARE CLEANERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Notes:MLD TO OXXO CARE CLEANERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Notes:GALLERIT

    Read MoreRead Less
398 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER HCOATES JR DTD 6/9/20 EX PARTE ORDER LIMITING SERVICE OF PLEADINGS; Notes:HCOATES JR DTD 6/9/20 EX PARTE ORDER LIMITING SERVICE OF PLEADINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Notes:FOR VALIDATION OF TAX WARRANTS (F/B PETITIONER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION EX-PARTE MOTION TO LIMIT SERVICE OF PLEADINGS; Notes:EX-PARTE MOTION TO LIMIT SERVICE OF PLEADINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3624237; Receipt Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$401.00; total Amount Paid:$401.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:05/11/2020; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 3624237; Notes:$401.00 3624237 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AN: Circuit Civil Central - AN (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF INTENT; Notes:TO FILE ACTION F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JNR Builders, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where LASER LIGHT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HEALTHTRUST WORKFORCE SOLUTIONS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Pellegrino, Tara S