This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 10/25/2022 at 17:15:46 (UTC).

ANDERSON, JEREMIAH V KNIGHT, SHAWNTA

Case Summary

On 09/15/2022 ANDERSON, JEREMIAH filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against KNIGHT, SHAWNTA. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ZUCKERMAN , ASHLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ZUCKERMAN , ASHLEY

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

ANDERSON , JEREMIAH

DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

Defendant and Respondent

KNIGHT , SHAWNTA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Notes: NOTICE OF HEARING FOR SUPPORT MATTER WITH REQUEST TO PRODUCE AT HEARING AND APPEARANCE BY ZOOM (PLEASE SEE PAGE TWO FOR ADDITIONAL ZOOM INFORMATION 12/02/2022 08:45:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketRESPONSE TO: F/B- RESP; Notes: F/B- RESP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $0.00; total Amount Paid: $0.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 09/16/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 09/16/2022; Description: 701FF Civil Filings 39 61 741 742 747 752or753; Amount Due: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: FC: Family Central - FC (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: pmalaw@att.net TO BE SERVED ON SHAWNTA KNIGHT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketPETITION; Notes: SUPPLEMENTAL UNIFORM INTERSTATE FAMILY SUPPORT PLEADING F/B DOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketSOC SEC NO FILED; Notes: F/B DOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE FORM; Notes: F/B DOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketINFORMATION SHEET (DEMOGRAPHIC) OBO PARTIES; Notes: (DEMOGRAPHIC) OBO PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; Notes: F/B DOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketCIVIL DATE OF BIRTH; Notes: F/B DOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE is a litigant