This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 07/11/2019 at 21:48:58 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK V ODS CAPITAL LLC

Case Summary

On 03/08/2019 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ODS CAPITAL LLC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROWE , CYMONIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROWE , CYMONIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendants and Respondents

SHANE , HILARY

ODS CAPITAL LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MODLIN , SCOTT E

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

STRAUSS , DAVID A

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/08/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/08/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/08/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

03/08/2019:COMPLAINT

PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 3073870

03/11/2019:PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 3073870

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

04/01/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

04/15/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

NOTICE OF HEARING

05/08/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

05/31/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

MOTION TO DISMISS

06/17/2019:MOTION TO DISMISS

RESPONSE TO: TO THE DFT'S MOTION TO DISMISS LAWSUIT AND COMPEL ARBITRATION F/B PLT

06/25/2019:RESPONSE TO: TO THE DFT'S MOTION TO DISMISS LAWSUIT AND COMPEL ARBITRATION F/B PLT

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

06/26/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED HILARY SHANE - 05/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO: TO THE DFT'S MOTION TO DISMISS LAWSUIT AND COMPEL ARBITRATION F/B PLT; Notes:TO THE DFT'S MOTION TO DISMISS LAWSUIT AND COMPEL ARBITRATION F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Notes:AND TO COMPEL ARBITRATION - F/B DFT'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:AS COUNSEL FOR HILARY SHANE AND INCORPORATED MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME FILED BY ATTY STRAUSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:NOTICE OF HEARING 06/18/2019 08:45:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:AND INCORPORATED MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME F/B DFT ODS CAPITAL LLC ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ODS CAPITAL LLC - 03/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 3073870; Notes:$421.00 3073870 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AI: Circuit Civil Central - AI (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:pleadings@lssmlaw.com;jaritsa.sanabria@lssmlaw.com;TEQUITA.COOLEY@LSSMLAW.COM ISSUED TO HILARY SHANE EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:pleadings@lssmlaw.com;jaritsa.sanabria@lssmlaw.com;TEQUITA.COOLEY@LSSMLAW.COM ISSUED TO ODS CAPITAL LLC EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketReceipt Number:3073870; Receipt Amount: $421.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketTotals: total Amount Due:$421.00; total Amount Paid:$421.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketDue Date:03/11/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketDue Date:03/11/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketDue Date:03/11/2019; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ODS Capital LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Strauss, David A.