Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 04/21/2021 at 18:04:25 (UTC).

ALTAMONTE FAMILY WELLNESS MEDICAL CENTER INC A/A/O KEITH RILEY V PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 ALTAMONTE FAMILY WELLNESS MEDICAL CENTER INC A/A/O KEITH RILEY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PARNOFIELLO , JOHN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PARNOFIELLO , JOHN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ALTAMONTE FAMILY WELLNESS MEDICAL CENTER INC A/A/O KEITH RILEY

Defendant and Respondent

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

THOMPSON , NICHOLAS

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

CAMERON , JESSICA M

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF FILING UPON TRANSFER

04/20/2021:NOTICE OF FILING UPON TRANSFER

NOTICE OF HEARING ON TRANSFER CASE

04/20/2021:NOTICE OF HEARING ON TRANSFER CASE

PAID $175.00 ON RECEIPT 3994369

04/20/2021:PAID $175.00 ON RECEIPT 3994369

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S REOUEST FOR PRODUCTION

04/16/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S REOUEST FOR PRODUCTION

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

04/16/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT MEMORANDUM REGARDING DISCOVERY REOUESTS FOR MATERIALS

04/16/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT MEMORANDUM REGARDING DISCOVERY REOUESTS FOR MATERIALS

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL

04/16/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S REOUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/16/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S REOUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

04/16/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DEFENDANT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

04/16/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DEFENDANT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

04/16/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516

04/16/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEYS, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

04/16/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEYS, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

04/16/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT COMPLAINT

04/16/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT COMPLAINT

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT NOTICE OF FILING PROPOSED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

04/16/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT NOTICE OF FILING PROPOSED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

CERTIFIED COPY

04/16/2021:CERTIFIED COPY

RECEIPT OF

04/16/2021:RECEIPT OF

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2021
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location:MB; Room:ZOOM PIP Pre-Trial (Main Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3994369; Receipt Amount: $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING UPON TRANSFER; Notes:JESSICA_M_SADE@PROGRESSIVE.COM ; PIPSERVICE@RTRLAW.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON TRANSFER CASE; Notes:JESSICA_M_SADE@PROGRESSIVE.COM ; PIPSERVICE@RTRLAW.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 5/24/2021 1:30 PM PIP, HEARINGS; Notes:SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 5/24/2021 1:30 PM PIP, HEARINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $175.00 ON RECEIPT 3994369; Notes:$175.00 3994369 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketDISBURSEMENT REQUEST; Notes:3994369 $160.00 REIFKIND, THOMPSON & RUDZINSKI LLP OPERATING CHECK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$175.00; total Amount Paid:$175.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:04/16/2021; Description:406FF County Civil Claim >$500 < $2500; Amount Due:$175.00; Amount Paid:$175.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S REOUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S REOUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REOUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Notes:DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REOUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEYS, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Notes:NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEYS, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT COMPLAINT; Notes:COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT NOTICE OF FILING PROPOSED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Notes:NOTICE OF FILING PROPOSED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RJ: County Civil Central - RJ (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Altamonte Family Wellness Medical Center, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMPSON , NICHOLAS