This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 11/09/2021 at 15:05:09 (UTC).

ALLY FINANCIAL INC V JOHNSON, JAMIE

Case Summary

On 10/05/2021 ALLY FINANCIAL INC filed an Other lawsuit against JOHNSON, JAMIE. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHULLMAN , SARAH L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHULLMAN , SARAH L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ALLY FINANCIAL INC

Defendant and Respondent

JOHNSON , JAMIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

PALMA , JORGE

 

Court Documents

CERTIFIED COPY

10/05/2021:CERTIFIED COPY

CERTIFIED COPY

10/05/2021:CERTIFIED COPY

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

10/05/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT MEMORANDUM

10/05/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT MEMORANDUM

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF MOTION

10/05/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF MOTION

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE

10/05/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT NON SERVICE RETURN

10/05/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT NON SERVICE RETURN

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT SUMMON ISSUED

10/05/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT SUMMON ISSUED

NOTICE OF FILING UPON TRANSFER

10/05/2021:NOTICE OF FILING UPON TRANSFER

PAID $300.00 ON RECEIPT 4201572

10/06/2021:PAID $300.00 ON RECEIPT 4201572

RETURNED MAIL

10/19/2021:RETURNED MAIL

PAID $300.00 ON RECEIPT 4227437

10/27/2021:PAID $300.00 ON RECEIPT 4227437

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4227437; Receipt Amount: $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $300.00 ON RECEIPT 4227437; Notes:$300.00 4227437 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Notes:JAMIE JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketVOIDED RECEIPT 4201572; Notes:4201572

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $300.00 ON RECEIPT 4201572; Notes:$300.00 4201572 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$300.00; total Amount Paid:$300.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:10/05/2021; Description:400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due:$300.00; Amount Paid:$300.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING UPON TRANSFER; Notes:PLEADINGS3@ANDREUPALMA.COM EISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT SUMMON ISSUED; Notes:SUMMON ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT NON SERVICE RETURN; Notes:NON SERVICE RETURN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE; Notes:MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF MOTION; Notes:ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT MEMORANDUM; Notes:MEMORANDUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; Notes:COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY; Notes:CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY; Notes:ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RE: County Civil Central - RE (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ally Financial Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Palma, Jorge L, ESQ.