This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 08/14/2020 at 19:12:24 (UTC).

ALLEGIANCE ORTHOPEDICS AND SPINE INSTITUTE, PLLC A/A/O ARTHUR NUDELMAN V ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 ALLEGIANCE ORTHOPEDICS AND SPINE INSTITUTE, PLLC A/A/O ARTHUR NUDELMAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRYSON , MARNI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRYSON , MARNI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ALLEGIANCE ORTHOPEDICS AND SPINE INSTITUTE, PLLC A/A/O ARTHUR NUDELMAN

Defendant and Respondent

ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FISCHETTI , MICHAEL J

 

Court Documents

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/22/2020:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/10/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 3679197

07/10/2020:PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 3679197

SUMMONS REQUESTED

07/10/2020:SUMMONS REQUESTED

COMPLAINT

07/10/2020:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/10/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2020
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location:SB; Room:#6 (South Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY - 07/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3679197; Receipt Amount: $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$65.00; total Amount Paid:$65.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:07/10/2020; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:07/10/2020; Description:403FF County Civil Claim < $100; Amount Due:$55.00; Amount Paid:$55.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:MFPAESQ@GMAIL.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 9/1/2020 9:30 AM SB_PIP, HEARINGS; Notes:SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 9/1/2020 9:30 AM SB_PIP, HEARINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 3679197; Notes:$65.00 3679197 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RS: South Branch County Civil Division - RS (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less