This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 10/01/2021 at 19:46:03 (UTC).

ALFONSO, JOSE V ALEXANDER, DAVID R

Case Summary

On 08/27/2021 ALFONSO, JOSE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALEXANDER, DAVID R. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KASTRENAKES , JOHN S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KASTRENAKES , JOHN S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ALFONSO , JOSE

Defendants and Respondents

ALEXANDER , DAVID R

PLUMBING EXPERTS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BOETTCHER , IAN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/27/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

08/27/2021:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/27/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

08/27/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/27/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/27/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

08/27/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/27/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4159824

08/31/2021:PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4159824

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

09/16/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

09/27/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED THE PLUMBING EXPERTS INC - 9/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED DAVID R. ALEXANDER - 09/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4159824; Receipt Amount: $421.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$421.00; total Amount Paid:$421.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:08/31/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:08/31/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:08/31/2021; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4159824; Notes:$421.00 4159824 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AF: Circuit Civil Central - AF (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:TO DFT THE PLUMBING EXPERTS INC F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:TO DFT THE PLUMBING EXPERTS INC F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:iboettcher@forthepeople.com;aroark@forthepeople.com;lesquivel@forthepeople.com AS TO DFT THE PLUMBING EXPERTS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:TO DFT DAVID R. ALEXANDER F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:TO DFT F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:iboettcher@forthepeople.com;aroark@forthepeople.com;lesquivel@forthepeople.com AS TO DFT DAVID R ALEXANDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PLUMBING EXPERTS INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOETTCHER , IAN