This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/11/2019 at 12:46:55 (UTC).

ALFO LLC V TLH-20 HUGHES, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/09/2019 ALFO LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against TLH-20 HUGHES, LLC. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GOODMAN , JAIMIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GOODMAN , JAIMIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners, Respondents and Counter Defendants

ALFO LLC

TLH20 HUGHES LLC

TLH31 BIG DOG LLC

TLH23 HILL LLC

Defendants and Respondents

LYNX ASSET SERVICES LLC

BRIAN TUTTLE TRUSTEE OF KIDS FOR TUTTLE FAMILY TRUST

TLH226 GILES LLC

TLH-31 BIG DOG, LLC

TLH-34 LOWRES, LLC.

TLH-32 HADDEN, LLC.

TLH-27 LEMASTER, LLC.

TUTTLE , ERICA

TUTTLE , MICHAEL

TUTTLE , BRIAN

DEBEHNKE , NICOLE

SOUTHERN BLVD VILLAS, LLC

TLH-20 HUGHES, LLC

RLS/TLH HUGHES 1, LLC

RLS CAPITAL LLC

TLH-30 QURAESHI, LLC

Defendants, Respondents and Counter Defendants

LYNX ASSET SERVICES LLC

BRIAN TUTTLE TRUSTEE OF KIDS FOR TUTTLE FAMILY TRUST

TLH226 GILES LLC

TLH-31 BIG DOG, LLC

ALFO LLC

TLH-34 LOWRES, LLC.

TLH-32 HADDEN, LLC.

TLH-27 LEMASTER, LLC.

TUTTLE , ERICA

TUTTLE , MICHAEL

TUTTLE , BRIAN

DEBEHNKE , NICOLE

SOUTHERN BLVD VILLAS, LLC

TLH-20 HUGHES, LLC

RLS/TLH HUGHES 1, LLC

RLS CAPITAL LLC

TLH-30 QURAESHI, LLC

Petitioners and Counter Plaintiffs

TLH20 HUGHES LLC

TLH31 BIG DOG LLC

TLH23 HILL LLC

26 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent, Plaintiff, Petitioner and Counter Defendant Attorney

WEINBERG , BENJAMIN

Defendant, Respondent, Petitioner and Counter Plaintiff Attorneys

SCHULZ , TIMOTHY W

WEINBERG , BENJAMIN

CHAIT , MATTHEW R

MRACHEK ESQ, L LOUIS

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/05/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

06/02/2019:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/30/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

PAID $395.00 ON RECEIPT 3176383

05/21/2019:PAID $395.00 ON RECEIPT 3176383

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

05/17/2019:NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

ANSWER

05/17/2019:ANSWER

EXHIBIT

04/26/2019:EXHIBIT

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

04/26/2019:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/25/2019:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

03/18/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/25/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

MOTION TO DISMISS

02/13/2019:MOTION TO DISMISS

PAID $40.00 ON RECEIPT 3032464

02/11/2019:PAID $40.00 ON RECEIPT 3032464

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/08/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/08/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $1,970.60 ON RECEIPT 2990573

01/10/2019:PAID $1,970.60 ON RECEIPT 2990573

COMPLAINT

01/09/2019:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/09/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER SETTING HEARING; Notes:GOODMAN DTD 6/13/19: 8/2/19 @ 8:30AM, CTRM 9A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:DEFENDANT TLH-27 LEMASTER, LLC'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:DEFENDANT TLH-30 QURAESHI, LLC'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:CORRECTED - TO AMENDED COMPLAINT (TO CORRECT TITLE BY REMOVING TERM "COUNTERCLAIM") - F/B DFT'S TLH-30 QURAESHI LLC & TLH-27 LEMASTER LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:TO AMENDED COMPLAINT AND COUNTERCLAIM F/B DFTS TLH-30 QURAESHI LLC AND TLH-27 LEMASTER LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:DEFENDANT TLH-26 GILES, LLC'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO DISMISS; Notes:COUNTERCLAIM AND STRIKE DFTS THIRD AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE F/B PLT/CDFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:DFTS FIRST & SIXTH F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAID $395.00 ON RECEIPT 3176383; Notes:$395.00 3176383 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY; Notes:F/B ATTY L LOUIS MRACHEK OBO DFT RLS/TLH HUGHES 1 LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2019
  • Due Date:04/24/2019; Description:8XDT Additional DFT over 5 $2.50; Amount Due:$2.50; Amount Paid:$2.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Due Date:02/11/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Due Date:02/11/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Due Date:02/11/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Due Date:02/11/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Due Date:01/10/2019; Description:Lis Pendens 2nd Page or additional pages $4.00; Amount Due:$16.00; Amount Paid:$16.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Due Date:01/10/2019; Description:Lis Pendens 1st Page $5.60; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Due Date:01/10/2019; Description:Efile fee INDX $1 fee party after 4; Amount Due:$13.00; Amount Paid:$13.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Due Date:01/10/2019; Description:8XDT Additional DFT over 5 $2.50; Amount Due:$30.00; Amount Paid:$30.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Due Date:01/10/2019; Description:800F3 CircCivil Real Prop$250,000 or more PB; Amount Due:$1,906.00; Amount Paid:$1,906.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less