This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 06/09/2022 at 19:54:31 (UTC).

ALBANO, EVA V TKC CLXXVIII LLC

Case Summary

On 05/10/2022 ALBANO, EVA filed an Other lawsuit against TKC CLXXVIII LLC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HARPER , BRADLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HARPER , BRADLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ALBANO , EVA

Respondents and Defendants

COHEN COMMERCIAL REALTY INC

PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS INC

TKC CLXXVIII LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BEBERGAL , MARC L

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

CORREA , KRISTINA A

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/10/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

05/10/2022:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/10/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED DEFENDANTS NAME MUST MATCH EXACTLY AS THE NAME IN COMPLAINT

05/10/2022:~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED DEFENDANTS NAME MUST MATCH EXACTLY AS THE NAME IN COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/10/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/10/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/10/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/10/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

05/10/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

05/10/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

05/10/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

PAID $431.00 ON RECEIPT 4458975

05/10/2022:PAID $431.00 ON RECEIPT 4458975

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/10/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

05/18/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

05/18/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

05/18/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

06/03/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES F/B ATTY KRISTINA A CORREA OBO DFT TKC CLXXVIII LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TKC CLXXVIII, LLC - 05/13/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC - 05/13/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE COHEN COMMERCIAL REALTY, INC - 05/16/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4458975; Receipt Amount: $431.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $431.00; total Amount Paid: $431.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/10/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/10/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/10/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/10/2022; Description: 800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due: $401.00; Amount Paid: $401.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: OF SERVING PREMISES INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT TKC CLXXVIII LLC F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: PREMISES REQUEST TO DEFENDANT PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS INC F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: PREMISE REQUEST TO DEFENDANT COHEN COMMERCIAL REALTY INC F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: PREMISE REQUEST TO DEFENDANT TKC, CLXXVIII LLC F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: mbebergal@800goldlaw.com;mperez@800goldlaw.com;lmckenzie@800goldlaw.com AS TO PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS INC EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED DEFENDANTS NAME MUST MATCH EXACTLY AS THE NAME IN COMPLAINT; Notes: MBEBERGAL@800GOLDLAW.COM;MPEREZ@800GOLDLAW.COM;LMCKENZIE@800GOLDLAW.COM DEFENDANTS NAME MUST MATCH EXACTLY AS THE NAME IN COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: mbebergal@800goldlaw.com;mperez@800goldlaw.com;lmckenzie@800goldlaw.com AS TO TKC CLXXVIII LLC EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AE: Circuit Civil Central - AE (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COHEN COMMERCIAL REALTY INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Publix Super Markets Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bebergal, Marc L