This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 06/15/2021 at 20:17:45 (UTC).

AGUAYO, JOSE V GOLDMAN, RICKI

Case Summary

On 05/11/2021 AGUAYO, JOSE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GOLDMAN, RICKI. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURLEY , G JOSEPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURLEY , G JOSEPH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

AGUAYO , JOSE

Defendants and Respondents

GOLDMAN , RICKI

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE CO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

WARD III, DONALD J

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/11/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

05/11/2021:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

05/11/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/11/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/11/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/11/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/11/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4023600

05/12/2021:PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4023600

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

06/08/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

06/08/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE CO - 05/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE RICKI GOLDMAN - 06/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4023600; Receipt Amount: $421.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$421.00; total Amount Paid:$421.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:05/12/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:05/12/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:05/12/2021; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4023600; Notes:$421.00 4023600 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AI: Circuit Civil Central - AI (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:_wardteam@searcylaw.com AS TO DFT RICKI GOLDMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:_wardteam@searcylaw.com AS TO DFT PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:TO DFT RICKI GOLDMAN F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:TO DFT PROGRESSIVE SELECT INS CO F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:TO DFT RICKI GOLDMAN F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Donald J Ward Iii