This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 10/01/2021 at 19:49:44 (UTC).

AGARWALA, RAJESH MD V AMERIGAS PROPANE LP

Case Summary

On 08/27/2021 AGARWALA, RAJESH MD filed an Other lawsuit against AMERIGAS PROPANE LP. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURLEY , G JOSEPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURLEY , G JOSEPH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

AGARWALA MD, RAJESH

GUPTA MD, ARCHANA

Defendants and Respondents

AMERIGAS PROPANE GP

AMERIGAS PROPANE LP

CHONG , MILTON FABIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BARNHART , FORREST GREGORY

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

BEDARD , BENJAMIN L

 

Court Documents

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

09/27/2021:REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

09/27/2021:REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

09/27/2021:REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

09/22/2021:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

09/22/2021:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

09/22/2021:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

09/14/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

09/14/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

09/14/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

09/09/2021:NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

09/09/2021:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

09/09/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

PAID $431.00 ON RECEIPT 4158986

08/31/2021:PAID $431.00 ON RECEIPT 4158986

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/27/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/27/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/27/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

08/27/2021:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

COMPLAINT

08/27/2021:COMPLAINT

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:TO PLT'S COMPLAINT - F/B DFT MILTON FABIAN CHONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:TO PLT'S COMPLAINT - F/B DFT AMERGAS PROPANE, L.P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:TO PLT'S COMPLAINT - F/B DFT AMERIGAS PROPANE G.P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE MILTON FABIAN CHONG - 09/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED AMERIGAS PROPANE - 09/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED AMERIGAS PROPANE, L.P - 09/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY; Notes:F/B ATTY BEDARD OBO DFTS AMERIGAS PROPANE LP AND AMERIGAS PROPANE GP

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:08/31/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:08/31/2021; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $431.00 ON RECEIPT 4158986; Notes:$431.00 4158986 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AI: Circuit Civil Central - AI (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:_barnhartteam@searcylaw.com AS TO AMERIGAS PROPANE GP EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:_barnhartteam@searcylaw.com AS TO AMERIGAS PROPANE LP EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:_barnhartteam@searcylaw.com AS TO MILTON FABIAN CHONG EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes:F/B ATTY BARNHART OBO PLTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERIGAS PROPANE LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARNHART, FORREST GREGORY