This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 10/01/2022 at 09:09:08 (UTC).

AFO IMAGING INC DBA ADVANCED DIAGNOSTIC GROUP AAO MICHELLE RICE V PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/11/2022 AFO IMAGING INC DBA ADVANCED DIAGNOSTIC GROUP AAO MICHELLE RICE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHULLMAN , SARAH L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHULLMAN , SARAH L

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

AFO IMAGING INC DBA ADVANCED DIAGNOSTIC GROUP AAO MICHELLE RICE

Defendant and Respondent

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

GUDIN , GREGORY E

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/11/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

08/11/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4573196

08/12/2022:PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4573196

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/12/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

09/16/2022:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes: CONTINUE PENDING PROPER SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location: MB; Room: 6M (Main Branch); Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4573196; Receipt Amount: $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $65.00; total Amount Paid: $65.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 08/12/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 08/12/2022; Description: 403FF County Civil Claim < $100; Amount Due: $55.00; Amount Paid: $55.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: EFILINGS@PIP-LAWYERS.COM E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 9/15/2022 8:45 AM SHULLMAN, SARAH L; Notes: SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 9/15/2022 8:45 AM SHULLMAN, SARAH L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4573196; Notes: $65.00 4573196 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RE: County Civil Central - RE (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AFO Imaging Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gudin, Gregory E, ESQ.