This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 11/27/2019 at 15:14:10 (UTC).

ADVENIR AT PGA LLC V DE CARDENAS, VIVIAN

Case Summary

On 10/23/2019 ADVENIR AT PGA LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against DE CARDENAS, VIVIAN. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, North County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CASTOR , FRANK S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-NB

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CASTOR , FRANK S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ADVENIR AT PGA LLC

Defendant and Respondent

DE CARDENAS , VIVIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LOWENHAUPT , KENNETH J

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

11/26/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 31042 PAGE 1101-1101

11/19/2019:DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 31042 PAGE 1101-1101

CLERK'S DEFAULT

11/18/2019:CLERK'S DEFAULT

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

11/13/2019:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

11/13/2019:MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

11/13/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

11/04/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

11/01/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/24/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 3386384

10/24/2019:PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 3386384

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

10/23/2019:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED; Notes:FORWARD TO PBSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DISPOSED BY DEFAULT; Notes:DD - DISPOSED BY DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 31042 PAGE 1101-1101; Notes:FOR REMOVAL OF TENANT -JUDGE CASTOR DTD 11/19/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S DEFAULT; Notes:PLEADINGS@FL-LANDLORD.COM ENTERED AGAINST DFT. E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes:IN RE: VIVIAN DE CARDENAS F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Notes:FOR REMOVAL OF TENANT F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes:AGAINST VIVIAN DE CARDENAS BY THE CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE VERIFIED POSTED VIVIAN DE CARDENAS - 10/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:PLEADINGS@FL-LANDLORD.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 3386384; Notes:$195.00 3386384 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RH: North Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RH (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • Receipt Number:3386384; Receipt Amount: $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$195.00; total Amount Paid:$195.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • Due Date:10/24/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • Due Date:10/24/2019; Description:401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due:$185.00; Amount Paid:$185.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less