Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 04/21/2021 at 18:05:06 (UTC).

ADVANCED ORTHOPEDICS LLC A/A/O ADRIANA FAJARDO V ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 ADVANCED ORTHOPEDICS LLC A/A/O ADRIANA FAJARDO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GARRISON , EDWARD A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GARRISON , EDWARD A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ADVANCED ORTHOPEDICS LLC A/A/O ADRIANA FAJARDO

Defendant and Respondent

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

THOMPSON , NICHOLAS

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

BERKMAN , TRACY P

 

Court Documents

PAID $55.00 ON RECEIPT 3994369

04/20/2021:PAID $55.00 ON RECEIPT 3994369

NOTICE OF FILING UPON TRANSFER

04/16/2021:NOTICE OF FILING UPON TRANSFER

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY AND SANCTIONS

04/16/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY AND SANCTIONS

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/16/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT SHOW CAUSE ORDER - FORUM NON CONVENIENS

04/16/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT SHOW CAUSE ORDER - FORUM NON CONVENIENS

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO REOUEST FOR PRODUCTION

04/16/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO REOUEST FOR PRODUCTION

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT TO DESIGNATE A RULE 1.310(B)(6) CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE FOR DEPOSITION

04/16/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT TO DESIGNATE A RULE 1.310(B)(6) CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE FOR DEPOSITION

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

04/16/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT SUMMONS ISSUED

04/16/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT SUMMONS ISSUED

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

04/16/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT COMPLAINT

04/16/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT COMPLAINT

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DISCLOSURE DESIGNATION OF PRINCIPAL E-MAIL ADDRES

04/16/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DISCLOSURE DESIGNATION OF PRINCIPAL E-MAIL ADDRES

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S REOUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/16/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S REOUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT NOTICE OF FILING PROPOSED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES

04/16/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT NOTICE OF FILING PROPOSED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

04/16/2021:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

RECEIPT OF

04/16/2021:RECEIPT OF

CERTIFIED COPY

04/16/2021:CERTIFIED COPY

CERTIFIED COPY

04/16/2021:CERTIFIED COPY

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2021
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location:MB; Room:ZOOM PIP Pre-Trial (Main Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3994369; Receipt Amount: $55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $55.00 ON RECEIPT 3994369; Notes:$55.00 3994369 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketDISBURSEMENT REQUEST; Notes:3994369 $160.00 REIFKIND, THOMPSON & RUDZINSKI LLP OPERATING CHECK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$55.00; total Amount Paid:$55.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:04/16/2021; Description:403FF County Civil Claim < $100; Amount Due:$55.00; Amount Paid:$55.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING UPON TRANSFER; Notes:PIPSERVICE@RTRLAW.COM ; FTLAUDERDALELEGAL@ALLSTATE.COM EISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON TRANSFER CASE; Notes:FTLAUDERDALELEGAL@ALLSTATE.COM; PIPSERVICE@RTRLAW.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 5/17/2021 1:30 PM PIP, HEARINGS; Notes:SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 5/17/2021 1:30 PM PIP, HEARINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY AND SANCTIONS; Notes:MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY AND SANCTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT; Notes:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT COMPLAINT; Notes:COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DISCLOSURE DESIGNATION OF PRINCIPAL E-MAIL ADDRES; Notes:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DISCLOSURE DESIGNATION OF PRINCIPAL E-MAIL ADDRES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S REOUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S REOUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT NOTICE OF FILING PROPOSED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES; Notes:NOTICE OF FILING PROPOSED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE; Notes:ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RL: County Civil Central - RL (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Advanced Orthopedics, Llc is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMPSON , NICHOLAS