This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 06/21/2022 at 15:16:03 (UTC).

ADVANCED ORTHOPEDICS AND SPINE SURGERY LLC (ASSIGNEE OF BLACKFORD, LORNA) V LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 ADVANCED ORTHOPEDICS AND SPINE SURGERY LLC ASSIGNEE OF BLACKFORD, LORNA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRYSON , MARNI and SURBER , MELANIE D. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRYSON , MARNI

SURBER , MELANIE D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ADVANCED ORTHOPEDICS AND SPINE SURGERY LLC (ASSIGNEE OF BLACKFORD, LORNA)

Defendant and Respondent

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KASPER , CHRIS

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/12/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

05/12/2022:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

05/12/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/12/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/12/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

05/12/2022:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4464458

05/13/2022:PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4464458

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/13/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

05/31/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

05/31/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

06/14/2022:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

ORDER DENYING MOTION TO INVOKE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND SETTING CMC- 8/12/22@9AM VIA ZOOM -JUDGE SURBER DTD 6/14/22

06/14/2022:ORDER DENYING MOTION TO INVOKE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND SETTING CMC- 8/12/22@9AM VIA ZOOM -JUDGE SURBER DTD 6/14/22

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

06/16/2022:VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketDISMISSED AFTER HEARING; Notes: DA - DISMISSED AFTER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes: WITHOUT PREJUDICE F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location: SB; Room: ZOOM PIP Pre-Trial (South Branch); Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DENYING MOTION TO INVOKE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND SETTING CMC- 8/12/22@9AM VIA ZOOM -JUDGE SURBER DTD 6/14/22; Notes: MOTION TO INVOKE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND SETTING CMC- 8/12/22@9AM VIA ZOOM -JUDGE SURBER DTD 6/14/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes: PLAINTIFF PRESENT, DEFENDANT PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: SERVED ON 5/19/22 ON LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: SERVED ON LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 5/19/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4464458; Receipt Amount: $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $65.00; total Amount Paid: $65.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/13/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: SERVICE@WESETTHESTANDARDS.COM E ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 6/14/2022 9:30 AM BRYSON, MARNI; Notes: SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 6/14/2022 9:30 AM BRYSON, MARNI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4464458; Notes: $65.00 4464458 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RS: South Branch County Civil Division - RS (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Advanced Orthopedics & Spine Surgery LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KASPER , CHRIS