This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 09/20/2022 at 15:34:41 (UTC).

ADVANCED ORTHOPEDICS AND PAIN MANAGEMENT PL AAO LAUREN ALBORN V UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/11/2022 ADVANCED ORTHOPEDICS AND PAIN MANAGEMENT PL AAO LAUREN ALBORN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BURKE , LAUREN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BURKE , LAUREN

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

ADVANCED ORTHOPEDICS AND PAIN MANAGEMENT PL AAO LAUREN ALBORN

Defendant and Respondent

UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

GUDIN , GREGORY E

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/11/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

08/11/2022:COMPLAINT

PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4573469

08/12/2022:PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4573469

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/12/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2022
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location: MB; Room: 6J (Main Branch); Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4573469; Receipt Amount: $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $65.00; total Amount Paid: $65.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 08/12/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 08/12/2022; Description: 403FF County Civil Claim < $100; Amount Due: $55.00; Amount Paid: $55.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: EFILINGS@PIP-LAWYERS.COM E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 9/15/2022 2:30 PM BURKE, LAUREN; Notes: SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 9/15/2022 2:30 PM BURKE, LAUREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4573469; Notes: $65.00 4573469 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RJ: County Civil Central - RJ (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADVANCED ORTHOPEDICS & PAIN MANAGEMENT, P.L. is a litigant

Latest cases where United Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gudin, Gregory E, ESQ.