This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 02/26/2022 at 01:19:57 (UTC).

ACORN WELLNESS CENTER LLC V STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/09/2021 ACORN WELLNESS CENTER LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CORLEW , REGINALD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CORLEW , REGINALD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ACORN WELLNESS CENTER LLC

Defendant and Respondent

STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SALK PA, KENNETH B

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

ROMILUS , SHANELLE

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/09/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/09/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4277313

12/10/2021:PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4277313

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/10/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

01/05/2022:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/17/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

01/20/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

01/24/2022:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDISMISSED AFTER HEARING; Notes:DA - DISMISSED AFTER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes:FB PLT- W/ PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY - 01/11/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes:PLAINTIFF PRESENT, DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location:SB; Room:ZOOM PIP Pre-Trial (South Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4277313; Receipt Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$185.00; total Amount Paid:$185.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:12/10/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:12/10/2021; Description:406FF County Civil Claim >$500 < $2500; Amount Due:$175.00; Amount Paid:$175.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:PLEADINGS@SALKLAWFIRM.COM TO DFT, E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 1/4/2022 9:30 AM CORLEW, REGINALD; Notes:SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 1/4/2022 9:30 AM CORLEW, REGINALD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4277313; Notes:$185.00 4277313 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RD: South Branch County Civil Division - RD (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes:FOR DAMAGES FB PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACORN WELLNESS CENTER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SALK PA, KENNETH B