This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 05/24/2022 at 15:15:42 (UTC).

ACORN WELLNESS CENTER, LLC. V GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/14/2022 ACORN WELLNESS CENTER, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRYSON , MARNI and SURBER , MELANIE D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRYSON , MARNI

SURBER , MELANIE D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ACORN WELLNESS CENTER, LLC.

Defendant and Respondent

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SALK , KENNETH B

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

SHAH , MANSHI

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/14/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

04/14/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

PAID $90.00 ON RECEIPT 4429271

04/18/2022:PAID $90.00 ON RECEIPT 4429271

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/18/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

05/03/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

05/06/2022:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

05/18/2022:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

PRETRIAL CONF DISPO ORDER

05/19/2022:PRETRIAL CONF DISPO ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL CONF DISPO ORDER; Notes: JUDGE SURBER DTD 5/19/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes: PLAINTIFF PRESENT, DEFENDANT PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location: SB; Room: ZOOM PIP Pre-Trial (South Branch); Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes: F/B MANSHI SHAH OBO DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY - 04/29/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4429271; Receipt Amount: $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $90.00; total Amount Paid: $90.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 04/18/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 04/18/2022; Description: 402FF County Civil Claim > $100 < $500; Amount Due: $80.00; Amount Paid: $80.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: PLEADINGS@SALKLAWFIRM.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 5/17/2022 9:30 AM BRYSON, MARNI; Notes: SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 5/17/2022 9:30 AM BRYSON, MARNI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $90.00 ON RECEIPT 4429271; Notes: $90.00 4429271 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RS: South Branch County Civil Division - RS (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes: FOR DAMAGES FOR PIP AND MEDICAL PAYMENTS F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACORN WELLNESS CENTER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SALK ESQ, KENNETH B