This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 02/24/2022 at 16:14:35 (UTC).

ACORN WELLNESS CENTER LLC V GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 ACORN WELLNESS CENTER LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CORLEW , REGINALD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CORLEW , REGINALD

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

ACORN WELLNESS CENTER LLC

Defendant and Respondent

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

SALK ESQ, KENNETH B

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

MILFORD , MELISSA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/17/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/17/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4182296

09/21/2021:PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4182296

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/21/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING VENUE

10/13/2021:ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING VENUE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

10/19/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

10/26/2021:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/26/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

ORDER ON SHOW CAUSE HEARING

10/27/2021:ORDER ON SHOW CAUSE HEARING

RECEIPT OF

01/07/2022:RECEIPT OF

CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT

01/14/2022:CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT

RECEIPT OF TRANSFER CASE TO ST LUCIE COUNTY SIGNED REC'D 1/13/22 2022SC000103

01/21/2022:RECEIPT OF TRANSFER CASE TO ST LUCIE COUNTY SIGNED REC'D 1/13/22 2022SC000103

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT OF TRANSFER CASE TO ST LUCIE COUNTY SIGNED REC'D 1/13/22 2022SC000103; Notes:TRANSFER CASE TO ST LUCIE COUNTY SIGNED REC'D 1/13/22 2022SC000103

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT; Notes:RECEIVED FROM ST LUCIE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketDO NOT DOCKET ON THIS CASE; Notes:TRANS TO ST. LUCIE CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketDISPOSED - OTHER; Notes:DO - DISPOSED OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON SHOW CAUSE HEARING; Notes:COURT FINDS PROPER VENUE TO BE ST. LUCIE COUNTY -JUDGE CORLEW 10/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location:SB; Room:ZOOM PIP Pre-Trial (South Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY - 10/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes:PLAINTIFF PRESENT, DEFENDANT PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:DISCLOSURE AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS. F/B ATTY MELISSA MILFORD OBO DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4182296; Receipt Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$185.00; total Amount Paid:$185.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:09/21/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:09/21/2021; Description:406FF County Civil Claim >$500 < $2500; Amount Due:$175.00; Amount Paid:$175.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:PLEADINGS@SALKLAWFIRM.COM E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 10/26/2021 9:30 AM CORLEW, REGINALD; Notes:SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 10/26/2021 9:30 AM CORLEW, REGINALD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4182296; Notes:$185.00 4182296 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RD: South Branch County Civil Division - RD (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes:FOR DAMAGES- E-FILED BY PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:E-FILED BY PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACORN WELLNESS CENTER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SALK ESQ, KENNETH B